Steven P. Esparza v. The Boeing Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | S James Otero |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02259 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
The Boeing Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Boeing Defense, Space and Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Boeing Network and Space Systems
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven P. Esparza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago |
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 05/05 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Esparza. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Haney, Steven) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 04/24 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Boeing Defense, Space and Security, Boeing Network and Space Systems, The Boeing Company, identifying The Boeing Company; Boeing Defense, Space & Security; Boeing Network & Space Systerms. (Riordan, Patricia) |
|
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 04/24 4:48 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendants Boeing Network and Space Systems, Boeing Defense, Space and Security, The Boeing Company.(Attorney Patricia S Riordan added to party Boeing Defense, Space and Security(pty:dft), Attorney Patricia S Riordan added to party Boeing Network and Space Systems(pty:dft), Attorney Patricia S Riordan added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft))(Riordan, Patricia) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)
Fri 04/07 11:27 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Dale S. Fischer, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:17-cv-01679 DSF (MRWx) (esa) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 04/05 2:17 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Fri 03/31 9:50 AM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-02259 SJO(JPRx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Wed 03/29 11:28 AM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-02259 PA(JPRx). (rn) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/27 6:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Esparza. (Haney, Steven) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Thu 03/23 11:50 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 11:40 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 03/22 7:31 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Esparza. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-01679-DSF (MRWx) (Haney, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 7:27 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Esparza, identifying none. (Haney, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 7:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Esparza. (Haney, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 7:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Esparza. (Haney, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 7:20 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19561324 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Steven P. Esparza. (Attorney Steven H Haney added to party Steven P. Esparza(pty:pla))(Haney, Steven) |