Josie Gonzalez v. FCA US LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00545 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josie Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
J. Velarde, Inc.
Terminated: 03/22/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 12/19 4:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS CASE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The stipulation is approved. The entire action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (See Order for further details) re Stipulation to Dismiss Case47 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (vm) |
|
47 | 47
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 12/18 3:53 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez.(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 11/15 1:19 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. THE PARTIES HAVE STIPULATED TO THE ENTRY OF AN ORDER AS FOLLOWS: That Defendant shall pay the sum of $21,000.00 to Plaintiff and Plaintiff hereby agrees to accept said payment in full satisfaction of all claims for attorneys fees, costs and expenses in connection with this action. (See Order for further details) re Stipulation for Attorney Fees45 (vm) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
stip
Attorney Fees
Thu 11/07 4:24 PM
STIPULATION for Attorney Fees in the amount of $21,000.00 filed by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez.(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Stipulation regarding Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses | ||
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/04 10:15 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The deadline to file the dismissal documents is hereby continued to December 31, 2019. re Status Report42 (vm) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 11/01 12:50 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron M Brian counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Brian, Aaron) |
|
42 | 42
misc
Status Report
Fri 11/01 12:01 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding the Status of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez.(Colon, Maite) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/05 1:27 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Parties request for continuance is GRANTED. The deadline to file the dismissal documents is hereby continued to November 1, 2019. re Status Report40 (vm) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/30 1:56 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding the Status of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez.(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 08/21 9:47 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS OF PROGRAM CASES by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court will dismiss these actions with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 on September 9. But if either party wants a different procedural result, get your proposed docs in with Ms. Piper by September 3. And the remaining cases? By September 3, submit an updated schedule about how youd like to proceed. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Settlement
Tue 06/04 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez. (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
attorney
Association of Counsel
Wed 04/24 8:11 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Scott S. Shepardson on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 04/25 9:56 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court reviewed the parties joint letter to chambers1 outlining the proposed schedule for summary judgment motion practice. Im generally OK with the thoughtful proposal thanks for taking the time on this. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
attorney
Change of Address
Tue 10/02 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Sepehr Daghighian attorney for Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez. Changing attorneys address to 10250 Constellation Blvd, Suite 2500, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez.(Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Fri 02/09 12:44 PM
The Court conducted an extended status conference in the Fiat Chrysler cases on February 7. The Court concluded that it will set two of the cases (to be designated by the parties) for trial in July 2018. A separate scheduling order will be entered for those cases after the parties identify them for the Court. As to the remaining cases, all deadlines are vacated until further order of the Court. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program
Thu 01/11 4:20 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 12-01 is approved by District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 5:17-cv-00545 MRW. (rn) |
|
32 | 32
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 01/11 4:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.The Court sets the related cases for a case management conference in theinterbellum between the January and February mediations. The hearing will occur onWednesday, February 7, at 9:30 a.m. (mz) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 01/09 3:40 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steve Borislav Mikhov counsel for Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez. Alastair Hamblin is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez. (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Fri 01/05 7:04 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 12/21 2:39 PM
ORDER RE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE HELD BY MAGISTRATE MICHAEL R. WILNER. The parties confer with the Court regarding discovery disputes. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mz) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 12/20 2:38 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE: SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for 12/21/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mz) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
In Chambers Conference
Wed 12/06 12:34 PM
MINUTES [In Chambers] ORDER RE: MEDIATION SCHEDULE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. On November 7, 2017, the Court ordered counsel to "file a Notice of Mediation Date listing the date, time, and location of the mediation" in the above referenced cases. Instead, counsel filed a "Notice of Proposed Mediation Schedule" which did not include an agreed upon mediation date for any case. The Court hereby orders the parties to mediate each matter on the schedule as set forth below: January 18-19: Avina, Maria- 17-cv-00511-PSG-MRW, Bisto, Kirk Gordon-17-cv-02267-PSG-MRW, Flores, Deanna-17-cv-00557-PSG-MRW, Garcia, Robert-17-cv-02322-PSG-MRW, Hall, Renee-17-cv-01823-PSG-MRW, Huerta, Michael-17-cv- 00547-PSG-MRW, Jordan, Harold/Marna-17-cv-02435-PSG-MRW, February 13, 14, 15: Alvarado, Julio- 17-cv-00505-PSG-MRW, Cardenas,Rafael- 17-cv-02291-PSG-MRW, Corpeno, Walter/Brenda-17-cv-05580-PSG-MRW, Elenes, Juan, and Daisey-17-cv- 05415-PSG-MRW, Schwartz, Donna-17-cv-00568-PSG-MRW, Garcia, Ana-17-cv-02198-PSG-MRW, Gonzalez, Josie-17-cv-00545-PSG-MRW, Gonzalez, Maribel & Palacios, Alfredo-17-cv-02302-PSG-MRW, Hanson, Johan-17-cv-00549-PSG-MRW, Lee, Laura-16-CV-5190-PSG (MRWx), Tarango, Barbara & Hernandez, Freddy- 17-cv-02475-PSG-MRW. March 21-22: Alvarado, Abel- 17-cv-04307-PSG-MRW, David Blaquera- 17-cv-03382-PSG-MRW, Cieslokowski, Carl/Kathy- 17-cv-00562-PSG-MRW, Donner,David/Kathleen- 17-cv- 02303-PSG-MRW, Espudo, Maria- 17-cv-00560-PSG-MRW, Garcia, Jose- 17-cv-02665-PSG-MRW, Lawrence, Gloria- 16-cv-05452-PSG-MRW, Macias, Robert/Karen- 17-cv- 02314-PSG-MRW. The mediator, Phyllis Pollack, will mediate four cases per day at 8:30 a.m.; 10:30 a.m.; 1:30 p.m.; and 3:30 p.m. The mediations shall be conducted with ALL parties attending in-person. The mediations will take place at Ms. Pollack's mediation facilities, PGP Mediation, 865 Figueroa Street, Suite 1388, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Failure of counsel and all parties to appear ready to negotiate in good faith may be reason for dismissal for failure to prosecute. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (ab) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
In Chambers Conference
Thu 11/09 9:00 AM
MINUTES [In Chambers] ORDER RE NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. By no later than November 20, 2017, counsel shall file a Notice of Mediation Date listing the date, time, and location of the mediation scheduled in this case. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (ab) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Wed 09/27 5:27 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Phyllis G Pollack has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 08/16 8:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order/Referral to ADR by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez:The Court, having considered the parties' request for a referral to the Court's Mediation Panel, hereby ORDERS the thirty (30) above referenced cases to ADR Procedure No. 2, the Mediation Panel. The ADR Program staff has assigned Panel Mediator Phyllis G. Pollack to mediate all thirty (30) cases. Ms. Pollack shall volunteer her preparation time and the first three hours of the first session. Thereafter, she may charge her market rate for that session, should it continue beyond three hours, and for the mediation sessions of the remaining cases. (bp) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/08 2:44 PM
MINUTES OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having conferred with counsel, ORDERS that case action CV 17-5580 PSG (MRWx) be added to the list of cases, and that discovery be completed in all 30 cases by January 19, 2018. Further, a new Status Conference is set in all 30 cases for January 29, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. At that time, the Court will address any outstanding issues, including cut-off dates. A joint report shall be filed one week prior to the Status Conference. (Clerk to add the four cases listed in blue to the lead case docket.) Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
attorney
Association of Counsel
Mon 07/24 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Sepehr Daghighian on behalf of Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez. Filed by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez (Attorney Sepehr Daghighian added to party Josie Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Mon 07/03 2:20 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance18 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Mon 07/03 2:15 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance17 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Mon 07/03 2:09 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06),16 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Appearance
Fri 06/30 4:37 PM
Second NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steve Borislav Mikhov on behalf of Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
17 | 17
notice
Appearance
Fri 06/30 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steve Borislav Mikhov on behalf of Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
16 | 16
attorney
Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
Fri 06/30 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Steve Borislav Mikhov counsel for Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez. Changing firm name to Knight Law Group LLP. Changing e-mail to stevem@knightlaw.com. Filed by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez.(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 06/21 4:40 PM
TEXT ENTRY ONLY: [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The hearing date previously set is hereby VACATED. Parties ORDERED to appear for a Status Conference on July 10, 2017 @ 2:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 06/20 11:11 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Mon 06/19 3:39 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16cv5190 PSG(MRWx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:17-cv-00545 PSG(MRWx). Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (rn) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)
Fri 04/14 2:10 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:16-cv-05190 PSG(MRWx) (rn) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Related Case(s)
Tue 04/11 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-05190-PSG-MRW; 2:17-cv-02128-FMO-AJW; 5:17-cv-00505 JGB-DTB; 5:17-cv-00511-JGB-SP; 2:17-cv-02267-CAS-SS; 2:17-cv-02291-R-SK;5:17-cv-00562-AG-KS; 2:17-cv-02303-GW-JEM; 2:16-cv-05415-CAS-AS;5:17-cv-00560-JLS-KS; 5:17-cv-00557-CAS-SS; 2:17-cv-02198-ODW-SK; 8:17-cv-00536-MWF-GJS; 2:17-cv-02316-JAK-GJS; 5:17-cv-00545 RGK(FFMx); 2:17-cv-02302-BRO-RAO; 2:17-cv-01823-PSG-JC; 5:17-cv-00549 AB (PLAx); 5:17-cv-00547-TJH-RAO; 2:17-cv-02435-AB-SS; 5:17-cv-00572-CAS-AGRx; 2:16-cv-05452-BRO-GJ; 2:17-cv-02314-MWF-GJS; 2:17-cv-02249-DMG-PLA; 5:17-cv-00568-R-MRW; 2:17-cv-02475-VAP-KS (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 04/04 8:11 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only7 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form,5 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only,,,9 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 served on April 3, 2017. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/30 2:09 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for July 10, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (pso) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/27 7:49 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Declaration,3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on March 27, 2017. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/24 9:01 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. See Order for details. (sw) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 5:04 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge R. Gary Klausner. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-00545 RGK (FFMx). (car) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/22 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, identifying FCA US LLC is a Delaware Limited Liability Company and is not publicly owned. FCA North American Holdings, LLC is a Delaware Limited Liability Company that is the sole member of FCA US LLC. The sole member of FCA North America Holding LLC is Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V., which is a publically traded company incorporated under the laws of Netherlands. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/22 2:12 PM
DECLARATION of Kris Krueger re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 Declaration of Kris Krueger in support of Removal filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/22 2:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Shepardson, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number PSC 1602876 Receipt No: 0973-19557731 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Attorney Scott Steven Shepardson added to party FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company(pty:dft))(Shepardson, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - FCA's Answer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - J. Velarde's Answer, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Notice of Entry of Dismissal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/23 4:49 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC, J. Velarde, Inc., filed in State Court on 6/17/16 by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez. Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (car) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 03/23 4:52 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed in State Court on 7/18/16 by Defendant FCA US LLC. Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal(car) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 03/23 4:55 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed in State Court on 7/18/16 by Defendant J. Velarde, Inc. Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal(Attorney Jennifer A Kuenster added to party J. Velarde, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Brian added to party J. Velarde, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Steven Shepardson added to party J. Velarde, Inc.(pty:dft))(car) |
||
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 03/23 5:00 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Josie Gonzalez pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to J. Velarde, Inc. Submitted with Attachment 6 to Notice of Removal (car) |