Michael Huerta v. FCA US LLC, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00547 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Huerta
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
DCH Temecula Motors LLC
Terminated: 03/22/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
56 | 56
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/08 9:48 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The stipulation is approved. The entire action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. re Stipulation to Dismiss Case55 (vm) |
|
55 | 55
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 07/08 9:18 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Michael Huerta.(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |