Jose Acosta v. Retail Vision, Inc. et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Drozd |
Referred: | Sheila K Oberto |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00410 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Chieu Hua Heng
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Siv Hun Khoeu
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Retail Vision, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 08/18 4:22 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Close the Case; Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed,signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/18/17. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/17 10:19 AM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Jose Acosta. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 07/26 9:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The parties have filed a Notice of Settlement indicating that settlement has been reached,14 . The Court grants the parties' request to file their dismissal documents by August 24, 2017, and ORDERS the parties, no later than August 24, 2017, to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on counsel or parties who contributed to violation of this order. See Local Rule 160 and Local Rule 272. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/26/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 07/25 10:00 AM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT contingent upon execution of the agreed-upon settlement agreement by Jose Acosta. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minute Order
Wed 07/19 11:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Before the Court is the parties' Fourth Stipulation for Extension of Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint (the "Request"). (Doc. 12.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS this Request. ( Id. ) Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Defendants may answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than July 24, 2017. The Court also notes that the Request is untimely, as the deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint was previously June 30, 2017. (See Doc. 11.) The Court CAUTIONS the parties that it will not grant further untimely requests for extensions, absent good cause shown for the delay. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/19/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 07/18 3:09 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Fourth Extension of Time by Chieu Hua Heng, Siv Hun Khoeu, Retail Vision, Inc.. (Bonakdar, Roger) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 06/07 9:26 AM
THIRD STIPULATION and ORDER For Extension of Time For All Defendants to Respond to Complaint and FIRST STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference. Defendants RETAIL VISION, INC., dba RASMEY MARKET; CHIEU HUA HENG; and SIV HUN KHOEU (collectively herein "Defendants"), shall have until 6/30/2017, to respond to the Complaint. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/27/2017, is CONTINUED to 8/8/2017, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/6/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 06/05 3:36 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Third Extension of Time by Chieu Hua Heng, Siv Hun Khoeu, Retail Vision, Inc.. (Bonakdar, Roger) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 05/23 10:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Before the Court is the parties' joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint (the "Request"). (Doc. 8.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS this Request. ( Id .) Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that Defendants may respond to the Complaint by no later than June 5, 2017. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/23/2017. (Thorp, J) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 05/22 3:20 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time by Chieu Hua Heng, Siv Hun Khoeu, Retail Vision, Inc.. (Bonakdar, Roger) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/05 11:01 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Chieu Hua Heng, Siv Hun Khoeu, Retail Vision, Inc.. Attorney Bonakdar, Roger Shahriar added. (Bonakdar, Roger) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/17 11:39 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Retail Vision, Inc. served on 4/4/2017, answer due 4/25/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/17 11:38 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Siv Hun Khoeu served on 4/14/2017, answer due 5/5/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/10 9:39 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Chieu Hua Heng served on 4/2/2017, answer due 4/24/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for DAD
Wed 03/22 9:59 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Wed 03/22 9:58 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Chieu Hua Heng, Siv Hun Khoeu, Retail Vision, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary M. Best* *Mission Law Firm, A.P.C.* *332 North Second Street* *San Jose, CA 95112*. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT against All Defendants by Jose Acosta. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6973711)(Best, Zachary) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |