Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. v. CHD Transport, Inc., et al.
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony W Ishii |
Referred: | Sheila K Oberto |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00416 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
CHD Transport, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Balvinder Singh
|
|
Plaintiff
Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
47 | 47
order
Writ Issued
Thu 05/27 9:29 AM
WRIT of Execution ISSUED. (Rivera, O) |
|
Wednesday, May 26, 2021 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Application for Writ of Execution
Wed 05/26 2:27 PM
APPLICATION for WRIT of EXECUTION by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc..(Heald, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit writ of execution | ||
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Affidavit
Tue 05/18 11:07 AM
AFFIDAVIT and request for issuance of writ of execution by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.. Attorney Heald, Matthew P. F. added.(Heald, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Writ of Execution | ||
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Abstract of Judgment Issued
Fri 12/14 11:21 AM
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. (Flores, E) |
|
43 | 43
order
Writ Issued
Fri 12/14 10:55 AM
WRIT of EXECUTION ISSUED. (Flores, E) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Request for Issuance of Abstract of Judgment
Thu 12/13 11:46 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc..(Jenkins, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Memo of Costs Re Interest | ||
41 | 41
misc
Request for Issuance of Abstract of Judgment
Thu 12/13 11:42 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.. (Jenkins, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
order
Substitution of Attorney Order
Thu 12/13 10:01 AM
ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/12/2018. Added attorney Stephen E. Jenkins for Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., attorney Lisa Marie Simonetti terminated.(Flores, E) |
|
39 | 39
misc
Substitution of Attorney - Proposed
Wed 12/12 10:06 AM
SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.. (Jenkins, Stephen) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment
Fri 12/08 3:32 PM
JUDGMENT dated *12/08/2017* in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants pursuant to order. (Flores, E) |
|
37 | 37
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion for Extension
Fri 12/08 3:30 PM
ORDER Adopting35 Findings and Recommendations that the Court Deny Plaintiff's Writ of Possession as Moot and Grant in Part and Deny in Part Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Default Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/08/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 11/17 4:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Due to the pending Findings and Recommendations, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/30/2017, is CONTINUED to 1/25/2017, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 1/18/2018. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/17/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 11/15 8:00 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS THAT THE COURT DENY PLAINTIFF'S WRIT OF POSSESSION AS MOOT AND GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re22 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/14/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within twenty one (21) days. (Thorp, J) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Supplement
Fri 10/20 2:48 PM
SUPPLEMENT by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. re30 Order,22 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT Renewed Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Default Judgment . (Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Minute Order Order on Motion for Extension
Thu 10/12 3:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Supplement Record Regarding Applicable Law (the "Motion"). (Doc. 32.) Finding good cause, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. Plaintiff shall file its supplemental brief as set forth in the Court's October 4, 2017, order by no later than Friday, October 20, 2017. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/12/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 10/12 2:43 PM
MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to October 20, 2017 re30 Order by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc..(Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 10/05 10:30 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. re28 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/04 4:45 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Supplement Record Regarding Applicable Law. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/4/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 10/02 4:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Having reviewed the parties' papers and supporting materials, the Court finds the motion for default judgment,22 , suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Accordingly, the October 4, 2017, hearing is VACATED. The Court reserves the right to reset the hearing at a later date if it determines oral argument is necessary. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/2/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
28 | 28
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 10/02 2:49 PM
MEMORANDUM by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. in SUPPORT of22 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT Renewed Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Default Judgment .(Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Lisa M. Simonetti, Esq., | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Mitchell D. Cohen, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit One, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Fleming L. Ware, Esq., | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Ashley Huddleston, Esq. | ||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 09/27 2:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Due to the motion for default judgment22 pending before the court, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/3/2017, is CONTINUED to 11/30/2017, at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/27/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 09/22 4:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Supplement Record (the "Motion"). (Doc. 25.) Finding good cause, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. Plaintiff shall file the following by no later than Monday, October 2, 2017 : (1) evidence, such as declarations, supporting Plaintiff's requested hourly rates for each attorney for whom Plaintiff seeks fees in its motion for default judgment; (2) an itemization of the total costs requested by Plaintiff in its motion for default judgment; and (3) a brief discussion of whether the costs Plaintiff requests are recoverable under federal law. The Court notes that granting the Motion necessitates continuing the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for default judgment, currently set for Wednesday, September 27, 2017. Accordingly, the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for default judgment (Doc. 22) is hereby CONTINUED to October 4, 2017, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/22/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 09/22 2:21 PM
MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to October 2, 2017 re24 Order,, by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc..(Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/19 4:00 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Supplement Record. Plaintiff shall file the following by no later than Monday, September 25, 2017: (1) evidence-such as declarations-supporting Plaintiff's requested hourly rates for each attorney for whom Plaintiff seeks fees in its Motion; (2) an itemization of the total costs that Plaintiff requests in its Motion; and (3) a brief discussion of whether the costs Plaintiff requests are recoverable under federal law. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/19/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/24 11:26 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. re22 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT Renewed Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Default Judgment . (Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 08/23 8:14 AM
MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT Renewed Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Default Judgment by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto.(Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Stacie Van Bibber, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - to the Declaration of Stacie Van Bibber, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - to the Declaration of Stacie Van Bibber, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - to the Declaration of Stacie Van Bibber, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - to the Declaration of Stacie Van Bibber, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Mitchell D. Cohen, Esq., | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 1 - to the Declaration of Mitchell D. Cohen, Esq., | ||
Att: 8 Declaration in Support of Renewed Motion for Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 08/17 3:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Clerk's Entry of Default having been entered as to all defendants, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/31/2017, is CONTINUED to 10/3/2017, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/17/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/16 8:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. re19 Clerk's Entry of Default,18 Clerk's Entry of Default. (Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 08/10 11:42 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Balvinder Singh* (Marrujo, C) |
|
18 | 18
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 08/10 11:41 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *CHD Transport, Inc.* (Marrujo, C) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Request for Entry of Default
Wed 08/09 1:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CHD Transport, Inc., Balvinder Singh by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc..(Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration In Support of Request for Entry Of Default | ||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 08/04 11:04 AM
ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment14 . By no later than August 11, 2017, Plaintiff is once again ORDERED to file a request for entry of default against Defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 55. Plaintiff's renewed motion for default judgment against Defendants is ORDERED to be filed no later than August 25, 2017, and shall be noticed for hearing before the undersigned. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/3/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/03 10:01 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. re14 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT . (Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 07/31 1:17 PM
MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.(Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mitchell D. Cohen, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Stacie Van Bibber, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minute Order
Mon 07/24 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** On June 23, 2017, Plaintiff filed a status report in which it states, in pertinent part, that it "is in the process of moving for entry of default judgment against... Defendants." (Doc. 12 at 4.) However, to date, Plaintiff has not filed a request for entry of default. As such, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file (1) a request for entry of default against Defendants by no later than July 31, 2017; and (2) a motion for default judgment against Defendants by no later than August 14, 2017. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/24/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/23 8:23 AM
STATUS REPORT by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.. (Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 06/12 2:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The docket indicates Defendants were served on 5/13/2017; however, no answer has been filed. As the Defendants have not appeared in this case, the scheduling conference currently set for 6/27/2017, is VACATED and RESET for 8/31/2017, at 9:30 a.m. If Defendants fail to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Plaintiff shall file by no later than 6/23/2017, a status report setting forth Plaintiff's proposed course of action. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/12/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/07 10:14 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minute Order
Mon 06/05 4:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** On May 23, 2017, in response to the Court's Order (Doc.6), Plaintiff filed a proof of service indicating that service was made on Defendant CHD Transport, Inc. d/b/a Singh Transport by serving "Blavinder Singh," its "Corporate Secretary." (Doc. 8.) The Court notes that Plaintiff has not filed a proof of service for Defendant Balvinder Singh in his personal capacity. On or before June 7, 2017, Plaintiff shall file a proof of service or a status report indicating whether Plaintiff intends to continue to proceed with its action against Defendant Balvinder Singh. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/5/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/23 10:06 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: CHD Transport, Inc. served on 5/13/2017, answer due 6/5/2017; Balvinder Singh served on 5/13/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons
Fri 05/05 2:46 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Balvinder Singh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lisa Marie Simonetti* *Vedder Price P.C.* *1925 Century Park East, Suite 1900* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Minute Order
Tue 05/02 4:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** On March 29, 2017, the Court referred Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession (Doc. 4) (the "Application") to the undersigned for the purposes of entering Findings and Recommendations. (Doc. 5.) The Court notes that Plaintiff has not filed proof of service of the Application on Defendant. On or before 5/24/2017, Plaintiff shall file proof of service or a status report indicating whether Plaintiff intends to continue to proceed with its Application. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/2/2017. (Timken, A) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Wed 03/29 11:48 AM
ORDER Referring4 Application for Writ of Possession to Magistrate Judge Oberto, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/28/17. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Application
Mon 03/27 10:39 AM
APPLICATION for Writ of Possession (Claim & Delivery) by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc..(Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of A Jensen, | ||
Att: 2 Writ for Claim & Delivery of Personal Property, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Claim & Delivery of Personal Property | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for AWI
Wed 03/22 2:19 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2017 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Wed 03/22 2:17 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *CHD Transport, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lisa Marie Simonetti* *Vedder Price P.C.* *1925 Century Park East, Suite 1900* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT against CHD TRANSPORT INC. D/B/A SINGH TRANSPORTATION AND BALVINDER SINGH by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.. Attorney Simonetti, Lisa Marie added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6975767)(Simonetti, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement |