Alvarez v. NBTY, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cynthia Bashant |
Referred: | Bernard G Skomal |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00567 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
NBTY, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nature's Bounty, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Alvarez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colleen Lesher
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago |
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
147 | 147
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 02/17 11:03 AM
ORDER of USCA as to the Notice of Appeal filed by Rosa Alvarez. The stipulated motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal is granted. Each party shall bear its own costs on appeal and Plaintiff-Appellant shall pay any fees that are due. This order shall serve as the mandate of the USCA. (akr) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2021 | ||
146 | 146
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 02/12 3:07 PM
ORDER Granting Rule 41(a) Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.144 ). the Court dismisses this action with prejudice as to Plaintiff and without prejudice as to the putative class. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/12/21. (jmo) |
|
145 | 145
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 02/12 8:33 AM
ORDER Approving Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (ECF No.143 ). The Court approves the withdrawal of attorney Michael M. Chang as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/11/21. (jmo) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
144 | 144
motion
Dismiss
Thu 02/11 5:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To Plaintiff Alvarez by Rosa Alvarez. (Syverson, Patricia) |
|
143 | 143
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 02/11 4:08 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed) by Rosa Alvarez. (Chang, Michael) |
|
142 | 142
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 02/11 3:27 PM
ORDER Approving Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (ECF No.141 ). The Court approves the withdrawal of attorney Nada Djordjevic as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/11/21. (jmo) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
141 | 141
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 02/10 1:59 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion To Withdraw On Behalf Of Nada Djordjevic by Rosa Alvarez. (Djordjevic, Nada) |