Shakespeare v. Scan Health Plan, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Barry Ted Moskowitz |
Referred: | Mitchell D Dembin |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00568 |
Nature of Suit | 151 Contract - Medicare Act |
Cause | 28:1441nr Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 20
|
|
Defendant
SCAN Health Plan, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Twila Shakespeare
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/24 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by SCAN Health Plan, Inc. (Roan, Peter) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 01/09 9:55 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: The Court grants Defendant's motion to dismiss with prejudice. (mxn) |
|
9 | 9
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 01/09 9:25 AM
ORDER Granting Defendant's4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/8/2018. (mxn) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Motions Submitted
Fri 05/26 12:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER, Motions Submitted4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (no document attached) (rfm) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 05/19 8:10 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by SCAN Health Plan, Inc.. (Roan, Peter) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/12 2:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Scan Health Plan filed by Twila Shakespeare. (Calhoon, Patrick) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/12 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Allen Calhoon on behalf of Twila Shakespeare (Calhoon, Patrick)Attorney Patrick Allen Calhoon added to party Twila Shakespeare(pty:pla) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 03/29 5:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by SCAN Health Plan, Inc..(Roan, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of its Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies & Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/24 12:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SCAN Health Plan, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,,(Roan, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Certification of Service | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Fri 03/24 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by SCAN Health Plan, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,, . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Roan, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/22 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2017 00005863-CU-IC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9921699.), filed by Scan Health Plan, Inc.. The new case number is 3:17-cv-568-BTM-MDD. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(dsn) (sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1- State Court Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2- State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3- Notice of Case Assignment, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Lisa Davis, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lisa Davis, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Lisa Davis, | ||
Att: 8 Proof of Service |