Jon et al v. Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02391 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Donna Cerasaro
|
|
Plaintiff
Jon Cerasaro
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT CASE OPENING: Duplicate of 17-cv-2398 (jeg) |