McHenry v. Ainsworth et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert G James |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00437 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Sec P - Order to Strike Case
Fri 10/06 1:00 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER TO STRIKE for failure to: Pay the filing fee or submit IFP application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/6/2017. (crt,Leday, A) Modified on 10/6/2017 to edit text as memorandum (Leday, A) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Thu 10/05 11:32 AM
PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Reopen/Reinstate Case
Tue 07/25 4:01 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Reopen/Reinstate Case. The6 Strike Order is RESCINDED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff complete and submit his complaint on the approved forms by 8/24/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/25/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Tue 07/25 4:04 PM
ELECTRONIC MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 8/24/2017. Clerk manually noticed plaintiff with forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/25/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Reopen/Reinstate Case
Thu 07/06 2:33 PM
MOTION to Reopen/Reinstate Case by Kevin D McHenry.(crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Sec P - Order to Strike Case
Wed 06/07 4:32 PM
ORDER TO STRIKE for failure to: Submit document on approved form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/7/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 06/05 1:45 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/11 2:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin D McHenry. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Tue 03/28 10:23 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 4/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/27/2017.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 1983 form, | ||
Att: 2 IFP form | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 03/24 2:45 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/23 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Colby Ainsworth, Carl Cooper, Patrick Cooper, Rambo, Robinson, John Spiers, Stephen Sylvester filed by Kevin D McHenry.(crt,Adams, K) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/24 2:39 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M) |