Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Shaniek M Maynard
Case #: 2:17-cv-14102
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2017
Terminated:Aug 10, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Hughes, Martin & Associates, LLC
Represented By
R. Daniel Koppen
Koppen Watkins Partners & Associates
contact info
Defendant
John P. Hughes
Represented By
R. Daniel Koppen
Koppen Watkins Partners & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Greg Martini
Represented By
R. Daniel Koppen
Koppen Watkins Partners & Associates
contact info
Mediator
Glenn J. Waldman
Plaza 100, Suite 780 100 Northeast Third Avenue
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Plaintiff
Andrew Padula
Represented By
Nicholas Michael Murado
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, August 10, 2017
32 32 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 08/10 11:21 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). All pending hearings are CANCELLED, all deadlines TERMINATED, and all motions DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of the Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/10/2017. (jas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/09 5:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Andrew Padula (Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
30 30 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 08/07 12:32 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Greg Martini by Andrew Padula.(Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2017
29 29 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 08/04 3:48 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of HUGHES, MARTINI & ASSOCIATES, LLC by Andrew Padula.(Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
28 28 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 08/04 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Andrew Padula, Glenn J. Waldman. Mediation Hearing set for 8/14/2017 at 11:00 A.M.. (Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Fri 08/04 3:31 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re26 Notice (Other). Parties/Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties/mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional parties/mediator. (jas)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/04 12:04 PM
NOTICE by Andrew Padula re 22 Order,, of Pending Mediation (Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2017
25 25 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 08/03 10:11 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of ANDREW PADULA by John P. Hughes, Hughes, Martin & Associates, LLC, Greg Martini.(Koppen, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 08/02 8:08 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Greg Martini. (Koppen, R.)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 08/02 8:06 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by John P. Hughes. (Koppen, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
22 22 order Order Thu 07/27 11:19 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER amending the Courts 19 Paperless Order Requiring Early Mediation in light of21 Plaintiffs Response to the Courts Order Requiring Early Mediation and Request for Guidance in Adhering to the Courts Order. In light of the representation that Defendants attorney is out of state until July 30, 2017, the deadline for the parties to agree upon a mediator and file a Notice with the Court naming the chosen mediator and stating the date, time, and location for which early mediation has been scheduled is hereby reset to August 4, 2017. The deadline for completing early mediation remains August 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/27/2017. (as00)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/25 5:16 PM
NOTICE by Andrew Padula re 19 Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, (Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2017
20 20 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 07/20 10:32 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part18 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The parties may adjust any deadline preceding the motions deadline of August 14, 2017. However, the August 14, 2017, motions deadline and all deadlines thereafter shall remain as set in the6 Order Setting Status Conference, Calendar Call, Pretrial Deadlines, and Trial Date and Order of Reference to Magistrate. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/20/2017. (as00)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2017
19 19 order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 07/19 4:41 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EARLY MEDIATION. The parties are hereby required to participate in an early mediation within one month of the rendition of this Order. The parties shall, within seven (7) days of the rendition of this Order, agree upon a mediator and file a Notice with the Court naming the chosen mediator and stating the date, time, and location for which early mediation has been scheduled. If the parties are unable to agree upon mediator, they shall ask the Clerk of Court to designate a mediator from the list of certified mediators on a blind random basis. The Court emphasizes that this early mediation is in addition to, and is not in lieu of, the required pretrial mediation. Within one (1) day of the early mediation, Plaintiffs counsel shall file a notice informing the Court of the outcome. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/19/2017. (as00)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Amend/Correct Wed 07/19 3:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order by Andrew Padula. Responses due by 8/2/2017 (Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Wed 07/19 10:07 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/19/2017. (as00)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/11 1:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Andrew Padula. Replies due by 7/18/2017. (Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim More Definite Statement Wed 07/05 9:37 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for More Definite Statement by John P. Hughes, Greg Martini. Attorney R. Daniel Koppen added to party John P. Hughes(pty:dft), Attorney R. Daniel Koppen added to party Greg Martini(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/19/2017(Koppen, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order MTN DISMIS,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order MOR DEF STMT
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 07/05 6:09 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Hughes, Martin & Associates, LLC. (Koppen, R.)
Related: [-]
13 13 utility Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge Wed 07/05 1:23 PM
Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2017-38 to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Ch. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch, Jr no longer assigned to case. (jmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2017
12 12 order Order Fri 05/26 3:37 PM
AMENDED PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Reconsider the Court's Order Striking Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint in light of the fact that Plaintiff's filing complied with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). The 9 Paperless Order Striking Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is, hereby, vacated. The Court also grants in part and denies in part10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The discovery deadline is hereby extended until August 7, 2017. However, the Court emphasizes that the dispositive motions deadline of August 14, 2017 and all deadlines thereafter shall remain in place. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/26/2017. (as00) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/26/2017. (as00)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/26 3:35 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Reconsider the Court's Order Striking Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint in light of the fact that Plaintiff's filing complied with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). The 9 Paperless Order Striking Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is, hereby, vacated. The Court also grants10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The discovery deadline is hereby extended until August 7, 2017. However, the Court emphasizes that the dispositive motions deadline of August 14, 2017 and all deadlines thereafter shall remain in place. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/26/2017. (as00)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/26 2:57 PM
MOTION to Reconsider the Court's Order Striking Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; or in the alternative, for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (unopposed); and to Amend the Scheduling Order (unopposed) by Andrew Padula.(Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order (stipulated/agreed),
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order (stipulated/agreed)
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/26 4:10 PM
Reset Deadlines per 12 Order. Discovery due by 8/7/2017. (asl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2017
9 9 order Order Fri 05/19 2:18 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER striking8 First Amended Complaint. In relevant part, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 provides: "[a] party may amend its pleading once as a matter of course within: (A) 21 days after serving it..." The docket reflects that the initial complaint was served on March 24, 2017. See DE 5. The First Amended Complaint was filed 28 days later on April 21, 2017. See DE 8. Accordingly, the First Amended Complaint is hereby stricken for failure to comply with FRCP 15. On or before May 26, 2017, Plaintiff may file a Motion for Leave to Amend, to which the proposed amended complaint must be attached as an exhibit. Plaintiff must include in any such motion the certificate of good faith conferral required under Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/19/2017. (as00)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2017
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/21 10:30 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL against Hughes, Martin & Associates, LLC, John P. Hughes, Greg Martini, filed by Andrew Padula.(Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s)
Friday, April 14, 2017
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/14 12:03 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Hughes, Martin & Associates, LLC. Attorney R. Daniel Koppen added to party Hughes, Martin & Associates, LLC(pty:dft). (Koppen, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
6 6 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Judge Wed 04/12 11:35 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND TRIAL DATE AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE: (Status Conference set for 9/27/2017 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Jury Trial set for 11/13/2017 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 11/8/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Amended Pleadings due by 5/12/2017., Discovery due by 7/13/2017., Joinder of Parties due by 5/12/2017., Mediation Deadline 9/13/2017., In Limine Motions due by 8/14/2017., Motions due by 8/14/2017., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/13/2017.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/12/2017. (mc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 03/28 9:43 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Andrew Padula. Hughes, Martin & Associates, LLC served on 3/24/2017, answer due 4/14/2017. (Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 03/23 3:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Hughes, Martin & Associates, LLC (lrz1)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM Thu 03/23 3:31 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lrz1)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Thu 03/23 3:30 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Ch. Magistrate Judge Frank J. Lynch, Jr (lrz1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/23 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL against Hughes, Martini & Asssociates, LLC (d/b/a Martini, Hughes & Grossman). Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9589863, filed by Andrew Padula.(Murado, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)