New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lois Bloom
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:17-cv-01635
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2017
Terminated:Sep 18, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
DR. Gregory Shifrin, OB/GYN P.C.
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Erika Hannah Rosenblum
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ella Shifrin
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Erika Hannah Rosenblum
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gregory Shifrin
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Erika Hannah Rosenblum
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Defendant
Surgery of Tomorrow, LLC.
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Erika Hannah Rosenblum
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yuliya Lysenko
Represented By
Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Naydenskiy Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 18, 2017
17 17 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 09/19 10:06 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, endorsed on doc.#16 : It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action through their undersigned counsel that, in accordance with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Complaint in the above-captioned action and all claims alleged therein be dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own fees and costs subject to the settlement agreement; and that Plaintiff is precluded from bringing any further claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act or New York Labor Law, or any federal, state or local law, for unpaid wages, including overtime pay, for the period set forth in Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 9/18/2017. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2017
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/15 3:32 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by DR. Gregory Shifrin, OB/GYN P.C., Ella Shifrin, Gregory Shifrin, Surgery of Tomorrow, LLC. (Gutstein, Keith)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 09/12 4:00 PM
ORDER: The parties move for Court approval of their12 settlement agreement. The parties have agreed that defendants shall pay plaintiff a total settlement amount of $ 10,000, including attorneys' fees and costs, as further detailed in the settlement agreement. The settlement amount is to be distributed in three checks made payable as follows: (1) Yuliya Lysenko: $ 3,153.34 less applicable withholdings Related [+]; (2) Yuliya Lysenko: $ 3,153.33; (3) Naydenskiy Law Group: $ 3,693.33. This is a fair and reasonable settlement. The agreement does not include a general release or a confidentiality clause. Upon review of the circumstances of the case, the work required to resolve this matter, and the fact that attorneys' fees are 1/3 of the settlement amount (after deducting costs), the Court finds that plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs is reasonable. Accordingly, the Court approves the12 settlement agreement. The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing the case by 10/2/2017. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 9/11/2017. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-] presenting payment of economic damagespresenting payment of liquidated damagespresenting legal fees and costs
Thursday, August 24, 2017
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 08/24 12:54 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for all further proceedings. Judge Margo K. Brodie no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Thu 08/24 12:53 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
13 13 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 08/23 5:07 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by DR. Gregory Shifrin, OB/GYN P.C., Ella Shifrin, Gregory Shifrin, Surgery of Tomorrow, LLC.. (Gutstein, Keith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
order Status Report Order Tue 08/22 6:28 PM
ORDER: By letter dated August 9, 2017, the parties filed their request for settlement approval. (ECF No. 12.) At this time, Judge Brodie has not referred the parties' request for approval to me for Report and Recommendation. However, if both sides consent to a Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), a Report and Recommendation will not be necessary as I can determine the motion for settlement approval by order. If the parties consent, they shall file a form AO 85, Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge, by September 19, 2017. The fillable consent form AO 85 is available at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/forms/allforms/general_forms and must be signed by all parties and filed electronically. Otherwise, should the motion be referred to me, I shall issue a Report and Recommendation to Judge Brodie. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/22/2017. (Smith, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
12 12 motion Settlement Wed 08/09 10:03 PM
MOTION for Settlement by Yuliya Lysenko. (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report Order Thu 07/27 7:30 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time: By letter dated July 26, 2017 (ECF No. 11), defendants' counsel writes, with plaintiff's consent, to notify the Court that the parties expect the settlement agreement in this matter to be finalized and executed within two weeks and to request that the parties be given an extension of time to file their motion for settlement approval. This is the parties' second request for an extension. This request is granted. The parties shall file a motion for settlement approval, as required by Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), by August 9, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/27/2017. (Smith, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 07/26 9:51 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Fully Executed Agreement by DR. Gregory Shifrin, OB/GYN P.C., Ella Shifrin, Gregory Shifrin, Surgery of Tomorrow, LLC.. (Gutstein, Keith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/27 5:21 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Adjourn Conference: By letter dated June 26, 2017 (ECF No. 10), defendants' counsel writes, with consent of plaintiff's counsel, to notify the Court that the parties are close to settlement and to request that the initial conference be adjourned sine die . This is the parties' first request for an adjournment. This request is granted. The Court cancels the July 6, 2017 initial conference. The parties shall file a motion for settlement approval, as required by Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), by July 26, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/27/2017. (Smith, Roberta)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
10 10 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 06/26 12:17 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for July 6, 2017 by DR. Gregory Shifrin, OB/GYN P.C., Ella Shifrin, Gregory Shifrin, Surgery of Tomorrow, LLC.. (Gutstein, Keith)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2017
order Scheduling Order Mon 05/22 12:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court shall hold an initial conference on July 6, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York, 11201. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report with the Court by June 26, 2017. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. A request for an adjournment must be received in writing at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/22/2017. (Doody, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2017
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/19 4:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by DR. Gregory Shifrin, OB/GYN P.C., Ella Shifrin, Gregory Shifrin, Surgery of Tomorrow, LLC.. (Gutstein, Keith)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/19 4:18 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DR. Gregory Shifrin, OB/GYN P.C., Surgery of Tomorrow, LLC. (Gutstein, Keith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/17 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Hannah Rosenblum on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Rosenblum, Erika)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/07 2:53 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The parties filed a motion to extend defendants' time to respond to plaintiff's complaint by submitting a signed stipulation. (ECF No. 6.) This is the first request to extend defendants' time to respond to plaintiff's complaint. The request is granted. Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by May 19, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/7/2017. (Doody, Sara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2017
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/06 9:35 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by DR. Gregory Shifrin, OB/GYN P.C., Ella Shifrin, Gregory Shifrin, Surgery of Tomorrow, LLC.. (Gutstein, Keith)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/03 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Gutstein on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Gutstein, Keith)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 03/24 11:18 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 03/24 11:18 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/24 11:17 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/23 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against DR. Gregory Shifrin, OB/GYN P.C., Ella Shifrin, Gregory Shifrin, Surgery of Tomorrow, LLC. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9389201 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Yuliya Lysenko. (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/24 11:15 AM
Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]