Alabama Northern District Court
Judge:Karon O Bowdre
Case #: 4:17-cv-00450
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2017
Terminated:Jul 06, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 4:05 AM CDT
Defendant
McNeilus Companies Inc
Defendant
McNeilus Truckand Manufacturing Inc
Plaintiff
Heil Co, The
Represented By
Matthew Todd Lowther
Balch & Bingham LLP
contact info
George D Moustakas
Harness, Dickey & Pierce PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/17/2017 8:42 AM CST
Thursday, March 23, 2017
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2812560 (ALND B4601078932) related document1 COMPLAINT against McNeilus Companies Inc, McNeilus Truckand Manufacturing Inc, filed by Heil Co, The.(SAC ). (Lowther, Matthew) Modified on 3/24/2017 (KEK).
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT against McNeilus Companies Inc, McNeilus Truckand Manufacturing Inc, filed by Heil Co, The.(SAC )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
2 2 Request for service by certified mail for McNeilus Companies Inc, filed by Heil Co, The. (SAC )
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for service by certified mail of McNeilus Truck and Manufacturing, Inc., filed by Heil Co, The. (SAC )
Related: [-]