Wade v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-08060 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 04/23 11:29 AM
ORDER: The Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b)36 is granted. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/23/2019. (LMR) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/25 11:06 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:36 First MOTION for Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 03/11 4:50 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) by Timothy Wade.(Phillips, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Federal Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Time Record, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
minute_ord
Minute Order
Tue 06/12 11:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to LRCiv 79.1(a) all non-electronically submitted administrative records offered by any party, whether or not received into evidence, in Social Security cases and other cases reviewed under the Administrative Procedure Act will be returned to counsel at the conclusion of the action, including any appeal, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Accordingly, the Administrative Records submitted on 06/26/17 and 09/26/17 are being returned to the filer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 03/16 1:34 PM
ORDER that the Stipulation33 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be awarded $2,664.92 in attorney's fees pursuant to the EAJA (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/15/18. (CLB) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Timothy Wade.(Phillips, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Clerks Judgment
Wed 01/31 4:10 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed January 31, 2018, judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. The decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is reversed, and this matter is remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings consistent with the Order. (EJA) |
|
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to Agency
Wed 01/31 4:06 PM
ORDER granting30 Stipulated Motion for Remand. ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner is reversed and remanded for further administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant, reversing the Commissioner's decision and remanding this matter for further proceedings as set forth in this Order, in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/31/18. (EJA) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Remand to Agency
Mon 12/18 8:16 AM
First MOTION to Remand to Social Security Stipulated by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 12/14 12:40 PM
ORDER that the Motion for Extension of Time26 is granted. Defendant shall have until December 20, 2017 to file a Response Brief. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 12/14/17. (CLB) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Affidavit
Wed 12/13 4:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Timothy Wade Assignment of EAJA fee by Plaintiff Timothy Wade. (Phillips, John) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Declaration
Tue 12/12 2:53 PM
DECLARATION of Thomas M. Elsberry re:26 Third MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant's Brief Unopposed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 12/12 2:53 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant's Brief Unopposed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 11/30 3:23 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until December 13, 2017 to file a Response Brief. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 11/30/17.(CLB) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Declaration
Wed 11/29 3:06 PM
DECLARATION of Thomas M. Elsberry re:23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Brief, Unooposed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 11/29 3:05 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Brief, Unooposed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 11/01 9:38 AM
ORDER granting Defendant's20 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until November 29, 2017 to file a Response Brief. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 11/1/17.(CLB) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Declaration
Tue 10/31 1:46 PM
DECLARATION of Thomas M. Elsberry re:20 First MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant's Brief Unopposed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 10/31 1:45 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant's Brief Unopposed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Brief - Opening
Mon 10/02 12:19 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Timothy Wade . (Phillips, John) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Tue 09/26 4:19 PM
Remark: Paper copy of Supplemental Certification has received and stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 09/22 11:13 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's17 Second Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until October 2, 2017 to file an Opening Brief. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 9/22/17.(CLB) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 09/21 11:27 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief by Timothy Wade.(Phillips, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 08/22 2:18 PM
ORDER that the Motion for Extension of Time15 is granted. Plaintiff shall have until September 24, 2017 to file an Opening Brief. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 8/22/17.(CLB) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 08/21 2:32 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief by Timothy Wade.(Phillips, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript
Thu 07/06 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re:13 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/26 9:12 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
misc
Remark (Public)
Tue 06/27 8:07 AM
Remark: Paper copy of Administrative Record received and stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Wed 06/07 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Elsberry on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Elsberry, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service Executed
Thu 05/04 8:53 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Timothy Wade: Proof of Service re: Summons Issued, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint. upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 04/18/2017. (Phillips, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/11 10:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (BAS) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/30 8:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (BAS) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 03/29 10:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/29/17. (CLB) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/29 10:05 AM
ORDER that the Application6 is granted. Plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/29/17.(CLB) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/28 4:04 PM
*Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy Wade. (Phillips, John) *Modified to correct event on 3/28/2017 (REK) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 1:30 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until March 31, 2017, to file an Amended Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs or to pay the filing fee. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/24/17.(CLB) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 03/24 10:30 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Timothy Wade. (Phillips, John) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/23 4:50 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-08060 PCT-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/23 4:49 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Timothy Wade (submitted by John Phillips). (DXD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/23 4:48 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Timothy Wade Submitted by John Phillips). (DXD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |