NatureSweet USA LLC v. Cornejo et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | James A Soto |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00132 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:18 AM MST |
Defendant
Alberto Aceves Cornejo
husband 1545 Santa Monica Road
Carpinteria, CA 93013 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Karla Giovanna Marquez Junquera
wife 1545 Santa Monica Road
Carpinteria, CA 93013 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NatureSweet USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 09/19 12:23 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alberto Aceves Cornejo. Reason for return: Return to Sender, Not deliverable as addressed, Unable to Forward. Document number18 . (MFR) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 09/19 12:20 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Karla Giovanna Marquez Junquera. Reason for return: Return to Sender, Not deliverable as addressed, Unable to Forward. Document number18 . (MFR) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Mon 09/11 11:40 AM
JUDGMENT granting17 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Judgment. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff NatureSweet USA, LLC ("NSU") and against Alberto Aceves Cornejo, Karla Giovanna Marquez Junquera, and their marital community (collectively, "Defendants") as outlined on the attached document. It is further Ordered that NSU is the prevailing party in this action and is entitled to the recovery of attorneys' fees and costs incurred in connection with this action. It is further Ordered that NSU shall recover the following from Defendants, jointly and severally: 1) The principal sum of $44,468.33; (2) Post-judgment interest on the aforementioned principal sum at the rate of 6% per annum until this Judgment is paid in full; and (3) All attorneys' fees and costs NSU may incur in connection with the enforcement and collection of this Judgment (see attached PDF for complete details). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 9/11/2017. (MFR) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Judgment
Thu 09/07 3:55 PM
Joint MOTION for Judgment by NatureSweet USA LLC.(Garcia, Roberto) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Judgment | ||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 07/31 4:04 PM
ORDER that the requirement to submit a case management report is vacated, and the case management conference scheduled for 8/14/17 at 2:00 PM is also vacated. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 7/28/2017. (MFR) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 07/28 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by NatureSweet USA LLC. (Garcia, Roberto) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 06/30 2:56 PM
ORDER that this Order requires the parties to file a Rule 16 Joint Report by 8/7/2017. The parties shall appear for a case management conference at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A on 8/14/2017 before Judge James A Soto (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 6/30/2017. (MFR) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/23 11:36 AM
NOTICE re: Notice Regarding Readiness to Proceed by NatureSweet USA LLC . (Garcia, Roberto) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 06/13 10:30 AM
ORDER that pursuant to the Application for Withdrawal of Counsel (Doc.11 ), and good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the law firm of Greenberg Traurig, LLP, is withdrawn as counsel for Defendants. It is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall update the docket to reflect that Defendants are now proceeding without counsel, shall list their last known address in the docket (appearing at Doc.11 at p. 2, lines 1 to 5), and shall mail a copy of this Order to Defendants (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 6/13/2017.(MFR) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/01 5:16 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Application for Withdrawal of Counsel) by Alberto Aceves Cornejo, Karla Giovanna Marquez Junquera.(Hooper, Dana) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/20 3:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Alberto Aceves Cornejo, Karla Giovanna Marquez Junquera.(Hooper, Dana) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/03 12:10 PM
NOTICE re: Filing Proof of Service by NatureSweet USA LLC .(Garcia, Roberto) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Fri 03/24 3:50 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 3/24/2017. (MFR) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 2:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Alberto Aceves Cornejo. (MFR) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 2:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Karla Giovanna Marquez Junquera. (MFR) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/23 2:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NatureSweet USA LLC. (Garcia, Roberto) |
|
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/23 2:22 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14047040. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:17-CV-132-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 03/23 2:19 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by NatureSweet USA LLC. (Garcia, Roberto) (MFR) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 03/23 2:18 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by NatureSweet USA LLC. (Garcia, Roberto) (MFR) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/23 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14047040 filed by NatureSweet USA LLC. (Garcia, Roberto)(MFR) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |