Daniela Guevara v. Chipotle Services, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02272 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:12 AM PDT |
Defendant
Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chipotle Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Daniela Guevara
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Rebecca Bradford
Terminated: 03/30/2017
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 06/25 12:21 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case28 with prejudice. The following error(s) was/were found: Case is closed. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Case dismissed WITHOUT prejudice on 6/11/18. Missing proposed order.As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
28 | 28
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 06/25 11:02 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement has been reached filed by Defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC.(Cavanagh, Charles) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 06/11 10:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the parties recent Notice of Settlement26 , the Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice. On or before July 23, 2018, any settling party may move toenforce the settlement, apply to reopen the action, or stipulate to extend the deadline in which to file such a motion or application.1 If the settling parties do not file any such motion, application, or stipulation on or before that date, the settling parties will be deemed to have stipulated to a dismissal of this action with prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. The Court VACATES all other dates and deadlines in this action, and the Clerk of the Court shall close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Settlement
Fri 06/08 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Daniela Guevara. (Ahearn, Zoe) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 05/04 5:04 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zoe Lillian Ahearn counsel for Plaintiff Daniela Guevara. Richard T. Marquez is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Daniela Guevara. (Ahearn, Zoe) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 05/03 11:07 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The previously scheduled Telephone Conference set May 8, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. has been vacated and taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 05/02 2:11 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference RE Discovery Disputes is set for 5/8/2018 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mz) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 05/01 11:45 AM
ORDER RE JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO CONDUCT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO JUNE 18, 201821 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Continue
Mon 04/30 4:48 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue DEADLINE TO CONDUCT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE from April 30, 2018 to June 18, 2018 filed by Plaintiff Daniela Guevara.(Ahearn, Zoe) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 04/30 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jae Hyun Kim counsel for Plaintiff Daniela Guevara. Adding Jace Hyun Kim as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Daniela Guevara for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Daniela Guevara. (Attorney Jae Hyun Kim added to party Daniela Guevara(pty:pla))(Kim, Jae) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/16 1:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brenna L. Wolcott to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC and designating Amish Shah as local counsel18 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 01/16 10:42 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brenna L. Wolcott to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21101165) filed by Defendant Chipotle M exican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Attorney Amish Ashok Shah added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amish Ashok Shah added to party Chipotle Services, LLC(pty:dft)) (Shah, Amish) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Wed 05/24 9:32 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (smo) |
|
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 05/24 9:30 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This Order is to advise the parties and counsel of the schedule that will govern this case. THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES (Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2018 at 1:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 7/10/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Otis D. Wright II). See document for details. (smo) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Tue 05/23 10:03 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Daniela Guevara.. (Marquez, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Wed 04/12 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jacqueline R. Guesno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19667628)12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Applicant and local counsel failed to sign. Both used electronic signatures. (lt) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/13 4:23 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: granting12 Non-Resident Attorney Jacqueline R. Guesno APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, designating Eric H. DeWames as local counsel. (lt) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 04/11 1:52 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jacqueline R. Guesno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19667628) filed by Defendant Chipotl e Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Attorney Eric H DeWames added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric H DeWames added to party Chipotle Services, LLC(pty:dft)) (DeWames, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 03/30 9:59 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Daniela Guevara pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Rebecca Bradford. (Marquez, Richard) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/30 9:21 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Daniela Guevara, identifying Daniela Guevara, Plaintiff; Richard T. Marquez, Esq., Attorney for Plaintiff; Zoe L. Ahearn, Esq., Attorney for Plaintiff; Chipotle Services, LLC, Defendant; Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Defendant; and Rebecca Bradford, Defendant. (Marquez, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 03/28 10:07 AM
ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 6/5/2017 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) Modified on 3/28/2017 (lc) |
|
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 03/28 10:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (lc) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 11:36 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/23 3:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Notice of Related Case(s)3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 served on March 23, 2017. (Cavanagh, Charles) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 3:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC, (Cavanagh, Charles) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Related Case(s)
Thu 03/23 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Cavanagh, Charles) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 3:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Cavanagh, Charles) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC648041 Receipt No: 0973-19564510 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Chipotle Services, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attorney Charles C Cavanagh added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Charles C Cavanagh added to party Chipotle Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Cavanagh, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Summons), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Answer to Complaint), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal (Other Filings), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal (Declaration of Esther Smiley), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Esther Smiley Declaration | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/27 9:58 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Rebecca Bradford, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff Daniela Guevara. (esa) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 03/27 9:59 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC.(esa) |