Visemer De Gelt, LLC et al v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02293 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Robert W. Hirsh
|
|
Defendant
Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Visemer De Gelt, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 04/12 9:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. As a result of Plaintiff's failure to file a First Amended Complaint establishing the subject matter jurisdiction of this Court, this action is dismissed without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); see also Yourish, 191 F.3d at 98688; Ferdik, 963 F.2d at 1260. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/28 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Visemer De Gelt, LLC, (Weberman, Jance) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
Mon 03/27 12:54 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is accepted as filed. No Notice of Interested Parties. (L.R. 7.1-1) Counsel is instructed to file a Notice of Interested Parties by March 28, 2017. (cr) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 03/27 12:04 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 03/27 11:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Complaint does not include any jurisdictional allegations. Accordingly, the Court dismisses the Complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Despite Plaintiff's failure to adequately allege the Court's jurisdiction, a district court may, and should, grant leave to amend when it appears that subject matter jurisdiction may exist. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend the Complaint to establish federal subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, if any, is to be filed by April 10, 2017. The failure to file a First Amended Complaint by that date or to adequately allege the Courts jurisdiction may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. (lom) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 03/24 5:30 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Fri 03/24 5:28 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form,4 . Document number 4 due to clerical error. Notice of Deficiencies has the wrong caption on image attached that was issued in error by the docket clerk. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 03/24 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 03/24 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 5:15 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 7:22 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19568046 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff VISEMER DE GELT, LLC. (Attorney Jance M Weberman added to party VISEMER DE GELT, LLC(pty:pet))(Weberman, Jance) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CivilCoverSheet |