Morris v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Barry Ted Moskowitz |
Referred: | Jan M Adler |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00573 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Florence Morris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 11/27 1:15 PM
ORDER Granting25 Joint Motion to be Dismiss with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties shall each bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/27/2017. (mxn) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Dismiss
Thu 11/16 8:45 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Florence Morris.(Ibey, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/22 10:33 AM
ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing of Joint Motion for Dismissal. A joint motion for dismissal shall be filed with the Court and a separate proposed order for dismissal e-mailed to the district judge's e-mail address, on or before 11/20/2017. Failure to comply with this order may be cause for the imposition of monetary sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 9/22/2017.(mxn) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 09/21 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Florence Morris(Kazerounian, Abbas) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/19 4:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. A Case Management Conference was held on 9/18/2017. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 7/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 7/17/2018, if needed. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/7/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 3:30 PM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 9/19/2017.(mxn) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Case Management Conference
Mon 09/18 4:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Case Management Conference held on 9/18/2017. (Plaintiff Attorneys Jason Ibey, Daniel Shay). (Defendant Attorney John Vogt). Court to issue scheduling order. (no document attached) (cdc) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/14 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Vogt on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Vogt, John)Attorney John A. Vogt added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Wed 09/13 1:42 PM
Minute Entry by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2017 reset for 03:30 PM (instead of 9:30 AM) before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Counsel shall use the same call-in information previously provided. (no document attached) (cdc) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Fri 09/08 3:19 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order Governing Discovery (ECF No.16 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 9/8/2017. (mxn) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/08 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Swigart on behalf of Florence Morris(Swigart, Joshua)Attorney Joshua Swigart added to party Florence Morris(pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 certificate of service | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Protective Order
Thu 09/07 2:40 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order ; Stipulated Proposed Protective Order by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Rossum, Ann) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/07 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yana A. Hart on behalf of Florence Morris (Hart, Yana)Attorney Yana A. Hart added to party Florence Morris(pty:pla) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Withdrawal of Document
Thu 09/07 12:26 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order ; Stipulated Proposed Protective Order filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . (Rossum, Ann) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Protective Order
Wed 09/06 12:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order ; Stipulated Proposed Protective Order by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Rossum, Ann) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Following ENE
Tue 08/15 3:31 PM
Order Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Notice of Telephonic Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/15/2017. A proposed joint discovery plan shall be lodged with Magistrate Judge Adler's chambers on or before 9/11/2017. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 8/15/2017.(mxn) |
|
11 | 11
minutes
Early Neutral Evaluation Conference
Tue 08/15 12:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/15/2017. (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Shay). (Defendant Attorney Ann Rossum). Court to issue written order. (no document attached) (cdc) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/07 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Ibey on behalf of Florence Morris(Ibey, Jason)Attorney Jason A. Ibey added to party Florence Morris(pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Mon 06/12 3:09 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 6/12/2017.(rlu) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/09 5:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re6 Notice of Party With Financial Interest,5 Answer to Amended Complaint, (Rossum, Ann) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order of Judge Transfer
Fri 06/09 4:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 17-cv-00573-BTM (JMA).(rlu) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Thu 06/08 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Experian, Corporate Parent Central Source LLC, Corporate Parent Online Data Exchange LLC, Corporate Parent New Management Services LLC, Corporate Parent VantageScore Solutions LLC, Corporate Parent OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC, Corporate Parent Experian plc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Rossum, Ann) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 06/08 3:58 PM
Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint [First] by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Rossum, Ann)Attorney Ann Theresa Rossum added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/07 3:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed by Florence Morris. (Shay, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/24 8:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Florence Morris(Shay, Daniel)Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Florence Morris(pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 1:09 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dsn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/23 1:07 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9925350.), filed by Florence Morris. The new case number is 3:17-cv-573-BTM-NLS. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Kazerounian, Abbas)(dsn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |