Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10698 |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2024 |
Plan Confirmed: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
116 Acadian Ln
Mandeville, LA 70471-1788 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
400 Poydras Street Suite 2110
New Orleans, LA 70130 |
GPO
Aug 15 2018
Memorandum Opinion. Signed on August 14, 2018 (RE: related document(s)410 Order) (Rouchon, H) |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |