Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-40525

Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Case #: 4:17-ap-04013
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2017
Terminated:Aug 29, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Card Assets
Suite 200
Kennesaw, GA 30144
Represented By
Card Assets
contact info
Plaintiff
James L. Drake
James L. Drake, Jr. P.O. Box 9945
Savannah, GA 31412
Represented By
James L. Drake
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, August 31, 2020
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC Auto) Mon 08/31 7:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by RC. Receipt Number 536365. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2017
21 21 court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/29 10:34 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-4013 Closed (RTC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2017
20 20 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/28 12:50 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr.. (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2017
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 07/21 1:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 07/20/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
18 18 order Compromise/Settlement (Ch. 7 only)(order) Tue 07/18 11:53 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement Related [+] Filed on 7/18/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] Related Doc #17
Monday, June 19, 2017
17 17 motion Compromise/Settlement (Ch. 7 only) and Notice and Opportunity for Hearing Mon 06/19 12:32 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement and Notice and Opportunity for Hearing. Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr.. Responses due on or Before: 7/10/2017, plus an additional three days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Drake, James)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 04, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - No Import into CMA Mon 06/05 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 06/04/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, June 02, 2017
15 15 notice Creditors and Parties in Interest Fri 06/02 3:37 PM
Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Hearing Has Been Vacated. Related [+]. (RTC)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
14 14 misc Statement of Intent Wed 05/31 4:09 PM
Statement of Intent. to Move for Authority to Compromise Controversy Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. (Drake, James)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 28, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/29 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 05/28/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, May 26, 2017
12 12 court Hearing (AP - all types) Fri 05/26 10:41 AM
Notice of Show Cause Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 6/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at SAVANNAH COURTHOUSE. (RTC)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
11 11 misc Amended Certificate of Service Wed 04/12 3:14 PM
Amended Certificate of Service as to service of Amended Complaint Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/12 1:40 PM
Amended Complaint by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. against all defendants. Related [+]. (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 1
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Wed 04/12 1:10 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. (Drake, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Amended Certificate of Service Wed 04/12 12:51 PM
Amended Certificate of Service of Adversary Proceeding Complaint, Summons, Notice, and Rule 26(f) Report Format Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Friday, April 07, 2017
7 7 notice Defective Pleading (Case Mgr use only) Fri 04/07 10:40 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or Before: 4/21/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, March 31, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/31 4:25 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 court Summons Issued/Reissued Fri 03/31 2:18 PM
Summons and Notice Requiring Rule 26(f) Report. (CGC)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Amendment Fri 03/31 11:59 AM
Amendment Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
3 3 misc Amendment Wed 03/29 1:59 PM
Amendment Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, March 27, 2017
2 2 trustee Request to Defer Payment Mon 03/27 4:15 PM
Trustee's Notice of Deferral of Filing Fee in Adversary Case . Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake (Drake, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
court Case Assigned Mon 03/27 3:53 PM
Judge Edward J. Coleman, III added to case (CGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/24 11:23 AM
Adversary case 17-04013 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint by James L. Drake, Card Assets against Card Assets, Card Assets, Card Assets. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount $350 (Drake, James)
Related: [-]