BELVAL v. COLIN et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marc Thomas Treadwell |
Referred: | Charles H Weigle |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00110 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint
Thu 07/06 3:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/6/2017. (tlh) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Complaint
Mon 06/26 12:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint Filed by JAMES BRONSON BELVAL.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint Order to File Prisoner Account Statement Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 05/24 9:34 AM
ORDER 1 Complaint filed by JAMES BRONSON BELVAL ; ORDER to Recast Complaint: ORDER to File Prisoner Account Statement (Certified Copy); denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff shall have TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date shown on this Order to (1) pay the required $400.00 filing fee or file a proper motion to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee and (2) to refile his Complaint with the Clerk ofCourt. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 5/23/2017. (ggs) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 03/24 10:10 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by JAMES BRONSON BELVAL. Motion included in documents1 Complaint. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(cma) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Fri 03/24 10:07 AM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JAMES BRONSON BELVAL (cma) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/24 10:07 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Weigle issued at the direction of the Court. (cma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT against COLIN, JOHN AND OR JANE DOE filed by JAMES BRONSON BELVAL.(cma) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |