Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Case #: 1:17-cv-01056
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2017
Terminated:Mar 26, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe
Represented By
Sean William Martin
Carr Allison - Tn
contact info
Defendant
ESA Management, LLC
651 E. 4th Street - Suite 100
Chattanooga, TN 37403
Represented By
Sean William Martin
Carr Allison - Tn
contact info
Plaintiff
Janice Horne
Represented By
Mark G. Hatton
Morgan & Morgan, Pllc - Ga
contact info
Robert A. DeMetz, Jr.
Morgan & Morgan, Pllc - Atl
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
ESA P Portfolio L.L.C.
Terminated: 04/12/2017
Represented By
Sean William Martin
Carr Allison - Tn
contact info
Defendant
ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee LLC
Terminated: 04/12/2017
Represented By
Sean William Martin
Carr Allison - Tn
contact info
Defendant
Extended Stay America, Inc.
Terminated: 04/12/2017
Represented By
Sean William Martin
Carr Allison - Tn
contact info


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/16 9:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ESA Management, LLC. (Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
24 24 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/26 2:37 PM
ORDER: The parties having announced settlement, the Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk to administratively close this case. The parties shall file a dismissal upon finalization of the settlement documents. If settlement negotiations fail, the parties should promptly move to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/26/18. (bnw)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/26 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by ESA Management, LLC (Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/26 2:38 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bnw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
22 22 motion Summary Judgment Wed 03/21 2:12 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by ESA Management, LLC.(Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Incident Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit Janice Hornes Deposition taken October 31, 2017,
Att: 3 Exhibit Jimmie Hornes Deposition taken October 31, 2017,
Att: 4 Exhibit Staged photograph of elevator at time of the accident,
Att: 5 Exhibit Nateena Jones Deposition taken October 31, 2017,
Att: 6 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 7 Statement of Material Facts DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Monday, January 15, 2018
21 21 misc Leave of Absence Mon 01/15 11:40 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): February 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 2018, by Robert A. DeMetz, Jr. (DeMetz, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 11/20 2:26 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 2/19/2018. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/20/17. (jpa)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 11/20 1:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ESA Management, LLC.(Martin, Sean) Modified on 11/21/2017 to correct filing party (jpa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 07, 2017
18 18 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/07 2:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Janice Horne Rule 5.2 Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Interrogatories and Request for Production (DeMetz, Robert)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/07 12:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Janice Horne Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories (DeMetz, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2017
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Mon 10/09 2:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by ESA Management, LLC.(Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Tue 09/05 1:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by ESA Management, LLC.(Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2017
14 14 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 08/18 1:24 PM
Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Robert A. DeMetz, Jr replacing attorney Mark G. Hatton. (DeMetz, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Thu 08/17 3:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant ESA Management, LLCs Response to Plaintiffs Request for Production of Documents by ESA Management, LLC.(Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Initial Disclosures Thu 08/17 9:11 AM
Supplemental Initial Disclosures by ESA Management, LLC.(Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
11 11 discov Certificate of Service Tue 06/13 3:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by ESA Management, LLC.(Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Mon 05/01 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant ESA Management, LLC d/b/a Extended Stay Deluxes Response to Plaintiffs Request for Admissions by ESA Management, LLC.(Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2017
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/24 2:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is placed on a six-month discovery track. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/24/17. (jpa)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Initial Disclosures Mon 04/24 10:13 AM
Initial Disclosures by Janice Horne.(Hatton, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2017
7 7 discov Initial Disclosures Fri 04/21 2:58 PM
Initial Disclosures by ESA Management, LLC.(Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 04/21 2:21 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by ESA Management, LLC. (Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 04/21 9:22 AM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by ESA Management, LLC. Discovery ends on 9/18/2017.(Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/12 4:27 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against ESA Management, LLCwith Jury Demand, filed by Janice Horne.(Hatton, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 03/28 9:04 AM
Clerks Notation re2 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (jgs)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
3 3 order Order Fri 03/24 3:30 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/24/2017. (cmd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 03/24 2:52 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESA P Portfolio L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Extended Stay America, Inc. for ESA P Portfolio L.L.C.. (Martin, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/24 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc., ESA P Portfolio L.L.C., and John Doe. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7047751.)(cmd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions to ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee LLC,
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Request for Production to ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee LLC,
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Continuing Interrogatories to ESA P Portfolio Lessee LLC,
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions to ESA P Portfolio LLC,
Att: 6 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Continuing Interrogatories to ESA P Portfolio LLC,
Att: 7 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents to ESA P Portfolio LLC,
Att: 8 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions to Extended Stay America, Inc.,
Att: 9 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Continuing Interrogatories to Extended Stay America, Inc.,
Att: 10 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents to Extended Stay America, Inc.,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service of Discovery,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet