Heidenreich, Shawn v. Berryhill, Nancy
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | James D Peterson |
Referred: | Peter A Oppeneer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00235 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment
Mon 07/09 11:08 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Shawn J. Heidenreich against Nancy A. Berryhill awarding plaintiff attorney fees and costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. 2412 in the amount of $7,200.00. (jat) |
|
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 07/09 11:05 AM
ORDER granting24 Stipulation for EAJA Fees. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/6/18. (jat) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation
Thu 07/05 2:18 PM
Stipulation for EAJA Fees by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, (Janes, Daniel) Modified on 7/5/2018. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Mon 04/16 4:30 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff reversing and remanding this case for further proceedings under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (jat) |
|
22 | 22
14
pgs
order
Order deciding Social Security Action
Mon 04/16 4:23 PM
OPINION & ORDER reversing and remanding action to Commissioner for further proceedings RE:10 Social Security Transcript. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/16/18. (jat) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Text Only Order
Wed 11/29 9:35 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** In accordance with the court's July 17, 2017 order, Dkt. 12, the parties have identified three potential dates for an oral argument in this Social Security appeal. Because the court has a scheduling conflict with all of the proposed dates and the issues presented in the briefs do not appear to be unduly complicated, the court will forgo the oral argument and decide the case on the briefs. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/29/17. (jat) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 11/28 3:15 PM
Notice by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill of Availability for Oral Argument . (Janes, Daniel) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Brief in Reply
Mon 11/13 2:16 PM
Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Shawn J. Heidenreich in Support of10 Social Security Hearing Transcript. (Joint Notice of Availability for Oral Argument due 11/24/2017.) (Schultz, Barry) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Brief in Opposition
Thu 10/26 1:14 PM
Brief in Opposition by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill re:10 Social Security Hearing Transcript filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Janes, Daniel) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/26 1:13 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Robert Janes for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Janes, Daniel) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Brief in Support
Mon 09/11 2:33 PM
Brief in Support of10 Social Security Hearing Transcript, Reversing the Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security, by Plaintiff Shawn J. Heidenreich. (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 9/11/2017. (lak) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 08/25 2:37 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting in part14 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Support due 9/11/2017. Brief in Opposition due 10/26/2017. Brief in Reply due 11/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/25/17. (jat) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 08/25 1:26 PM
Motion for Extension of Time Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief by Plaintiff Shawn J. Heidenreich. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. Response due 9/1/2017. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 12:25 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by David Levitt for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Levitt, David) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
JDP Order on Oral Argument
Mon 07/17 9:28 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** This court's general practice is to schedule social security cases for oral argument. To facilitate scheduling, the parties must file a joint notice stating their availability for oral argument. The notice must be filed within 10 days after plaintiff submits a reply brief (or within 10 days after the reply deadline if plaintiff does not file a reply) and the notice must identify three dates on which the parties would be available. These dates must be between 30 and 60 days after plaintiff's reply brief is due, preferably on Tuesdays or Thursdays, at either 11:00 AM or 1:00 PM. If the parties have good cause for not being available on three days within the required window, then they may request a different date. After the parties file their notice, the court will notify them if and when it intends to hold oral argument. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/17/17. (jat) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/14 8:58 AM
ANSWER by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Social Security Hearing Transcript
Fri 07/14 8:58 AM
Social Security Hearing Transcript by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Brief in Support due 8/28/2017. Brief in Opposition due 10/12/2017. Brief in Reply due 10/27/2017. (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/18 2:13 PM
Summons Returned Executed. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/17/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/18 2:12 PM
Summons Returned Executed. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/15/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 05/18 2:11 PM
Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/16/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/18 1:47 PM
Summons Returned Executed. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/15/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
misc
Action Requested - Proof of Service
Fri 05/12 8:43 AM
Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (jat) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/27 12:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (jls) |
|
4 | 4
order
PAO Order Granting IFP
Mon 03/27 11:57 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/27/2017. (jls) |
|
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Mon 03/27 11:55 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (jls) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Mon 03/27 11:56 AM
Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (jls) |
||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 9:35 AM
Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shawn J. Heidenreich. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/24 9:32 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Barry Alan Schultz for Plaintiff Shawn J. Heidenreich. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 9:16 AM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill., filed by Shawn J. Heidenreich. (Schultz, Barry) |
|
Att: 1 AC Decision, | ||
Att: 2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |