Mayo v. Experian Information Solutions Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John W Sedwick |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00879 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:13 AM MST |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Mayo
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Collections Acquisition Company Incorporated
Terminated: 04/24/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 04/25 1:33 PM
ORDER FROM CHAMBERS The plaintiff filed8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc.6 ) is found to be moot. The Clerk will please close this case. (DXD) |
|
9 | 9
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 04/25 8:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Civil Case Terminated per8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 04/24 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Mayo. (Kent, Trinette) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Party Dismissal
Mon 04/24 8:29 AM
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by John Mayo. Party Collections Acquisition Company Incorporated (an Ohio corporation) terminated. (Kent, Trinette) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Tue 04/18 9:38 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated.(Dessaules, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 04/18 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Adam Dessaules on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Dessaules, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/24 12:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Collections Acquisition Company Incorporated, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated.(DXD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 03/24 12:24 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14052282. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John W Sedwick. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00879 PHX-JWS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 03/24 12:23 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by John Mayo (submitted by Trinette Kent). (DXD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14052282 filed by John Mayo (submitted by Trinette Kent). (DXD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |