Johnson v. Markel American Insurance Company et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00881 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:04 AM MST |
Defendant
Marine and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Markel American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill N Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 12/01 3:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Civil Case Terminated pursuant to38 Order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 11/01 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Markel American Insurance Company. (Epperson, Sarah) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 10/27 9:47 AM
ORDER: This matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated. All pending motions are found to be moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on November 27, 2017 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/27/17. (EJA) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
minutes
1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Thu 10/26 5:18 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade: Settlement Conference continued on 10/26/2017 by telephonic conference. Appearances: Mark Arnett for Plaintiff; Donald L. Myles, Jr., for Defendant Markel American Insurance Company; Charles E. Markle for Defendant Marine and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated. The parties reached a settlement. Counsel for Defendant Markel American Insurance Company, Mr. Myles, will file a notice of settlement. Hearing held 4:30 PM to 4:36 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BSB, ew) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Settlement Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Wed 10/25 10:06 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade: Settlement Conference held on 10/24/2017. The parties did not reach a settlement. Settlement Conference continued to 12:00 PM on 10/27/2017. APPEARANCES: Mark W. Arnett, Wayne C. Arnett for Plaintiff; Sarah Elizabeth Epperson, Donald L. Myles, Jr. for Defendant Markel American Insurance Company; Timothy Regis Grimm II, Charles E. Markle for Defendant Marina and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated. Also appearing: Plaintiff Bill N. Johnson; Valarie Jonas for Defendant Markel American Insurance Company; Jeff S. Brown, Alexander Ko for Defendant Marina and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated. Conference held 9:30 AM to 2:15 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESL) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
minute_ord
Minute Order
Tue 10/03 4:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Parties having contacted Chambers, IT IS ORDERED, setting a pre-settlement conference call for 10/5/17 at 4:00 PM Arizona time, before Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade. A conference call joining the parties on one line must be made prior to calling chambers. Plaintiff's counsel shall be responsible for joining the parties at the appointed time. No cellphones will be allowed. Land lines only. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BSB, ew) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 09/21 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Markel American Insurance Company. (Epperson, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 08/30 7:40 AM
AMENDED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Settlement Conference RESET to 10/24/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade. See attached document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 08/29/2017. (KAS) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 08/23 4:09 PM
ORDER granting32 Stipulation - The deadline for the parties to conduct a settlement conference is extended to November 20, 2017. The parties shall diligently work together to find a mutually agreeable date to conduct a settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade on or before November 20, 2017. The Court is not inclined to grant further extension to this deadline. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/23/17. (LAD) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/23 10:25 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Settlement Conference Deadline by Markel American Insurance Company.(Epperson, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 08/17 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Bill N Johnson. (Arnett, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 08/15 2:44 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 9/29/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 8/15/17. (EJA) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 08/10 4:16 PM
ANSWER to26 Amended Complaint by Marine and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated.(Markle, Charles) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 08/07 2:55 PM
ANSWER to26 Amended Complaint by Markel American Insurance Company.(Epperson, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 07/27 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Bill N Johnson. (Arnett, Mark) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/24 11:08 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bill N Johnson.(Arnett, Wayne) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 07/21 2:58 PM
ORDER pursuant to24 Stipulation: Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before 7/25/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/21/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation
Thu 07/20 4:17 PM
STIPULATION to Amend Complaint by Bill N Johnson.(Arnett, Wayne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 07/11 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Bill N Johnson. (Arnett, Wayne) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Mon 07/10 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Marine and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated. (Markle, Charles) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 06/08 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Marine and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated. (Markle, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 06/07 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Bill N Johnson. (Arnett, Wayne) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/05 3:33 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 2/23/2018. Dispositive motions due by 3/23/2018. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/5/2017. (TCA) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Amended Minute Entry
Thu 06/01 8:24 AM
AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY: Amending Doc. 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 5/31/2017. Discussion held. Deadlines discussed. Parties agree to a Magistrate Judge designation for settlement conference. Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade randomly drawn. Parties to contact her chambers for a date and time. Court will enter a case management order. APPEARANCES: Mark Arnett and Wayne Arnett for Plaintiff. Sarah Epperson for Defendant Markel American Insurance Company. Timothy Grimm II and Charles Markle for Defendant Marine and Bond Insurance Agency. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:58 PM to 4:16 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) Reason for Amendment: to reflect Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade drawn for settlement conference. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 05/31 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Marine and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated. (Markle, Charles) |
|
16 | 16
minutes
Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Wed 05/31 4:33 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 5/31/2017. Discussion held. Deadlines discussed. Court will enter a case management order. APPEARANCES: Mark Arnett and Wayne Arnett for Plaintiff. Sarah Epperson for Defendant Markel American Insurance Company. Timothy Grimm II and Charles Markle for Defendant Marine and Bond Insurance Agency. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:58 PM to 4:16 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 05/30 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Bill N Johnson. (Arnett, Wayne) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 05/26 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Markel American Insurance Company. (Epperson, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Wed 05/24 3:00 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Bill N Johnson.(Arnett, Wayne) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Case Management Order | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/22 10:49 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marine and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated. (Markle, Charles) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 04/10 11:11 AM
ORDER re Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2017 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/10/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/07 3:57 PM
MARINE AND BOND INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.'S ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Marine and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated.(Markle, Charles) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/07 12:57 PM
Defendant Markel American Insurance Company's ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal by Markel American Insurance Company.(Myles, Donald) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 03/29 8:09 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 4/7/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/29/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 03/28 5:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Marine and Bond Insurance Agency Incorporated, Markel American Insurance Company.(Markle, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/27 4:17 PM
NOTICE re: of Service by Bill N Johnson . (Arnett, Wayne) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Mon 03/27 9:51 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/27/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Errata
Fri 03/24 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Errata re:1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Markel American Insurance Company..(Epperson, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Coversheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Supp Civil Coversheet | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/24 1:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Markel American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel American Insurance Company. (submitted by Sarah Epperson) (EJA) |
|
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 03/24 1:55 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14052488. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00881 PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (EJA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/24 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2017-090450. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14052488 filed by Markel American Insurance Company.(submitted by Sarah Epperson)(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |