Brown v. Maricopa County Sheriff's Office et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas L Rayes |
Referred: | Bridget S Bade |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00885 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Clerks Judgment
Fri 07/21 8:35 AM
AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed May 30, 2017, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. This dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (REK) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 07/20 3:31 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed July 20, 2017, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. This dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (REK) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Tue 05/30 4:25 PM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Dominique Dishawn Brown. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/30/17. (SLQ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 05/30 4:24 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.2 ) is granted. The Complaint (Doc.1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/30/17. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment
Fri 03/24 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (REK) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Fri 03/24 4:38 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dominique Dishawn Brown. (2 pages) (REK) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 4:37 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Dominique Dishawn Brown. (2 pages) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 4:36 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Dominique Dishawn Brown. (7 pages)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |