Doug Miner v. ECOLAB Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02313 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 05:704 Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Feb 05, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
ECOLAB Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Soliz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosendo Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alex Salazar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alex Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Sandoval
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aubrey W Sinclair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ron Singh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ken Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sergio Hinostroza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arturo Soto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Wagner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ken Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruben Marquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rex Ho
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Friedman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Lee Dunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivan Camargo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Banuelos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isaac Atchison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Moes
|
|
Plaintiff
Doug Miner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, December 29, 2022 | ||
195 | 195
judgmentCV
Judgment
Thu 12/29 1:11 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff Glenn Payton shall be paid a service payment of $750.00 and plaintiff Doug Miner shall be paid a service payment of $2,250.00 in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement and this Order. Class counsel shall be paid $33,375.00 in attorney's fees, and $7,089.64 in costs inaccordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement and this Order. The Claims Administrator, Simpluris, shall be paid for its fees and expenses inaccordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement. The LWDA shall be paid $18,750.00 pursuant to the Settlement Agreement. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv) |
|
194 | 194
order
Attorney Fees Settlement
Thu 12/29 12:26 PM
ORDER RE: FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement187 is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Class Representatives Service Awards184 is granted. (iv) |