Patrick Sinay v. Essendant Co. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02315 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Essendant Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United Stationers Supply Co.
|
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Sinay
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Receipt
Wed 05/31 2:46 PM
Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Fri 05/05 11:01 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (mrgo) |
|
22 | 22
order
Remand Case to State Court
Fri 05/05 10:57 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson : granting11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court. Case Remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. BC651043. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 05/01 12:55 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Sinay. (Parker, Jill) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 04/21 2:20 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Essendant Co., re Non-Opposition to Motion19 served on April 21, 2017. (Barsanti, Jason) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/21 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Defendant Essendant Co.. (Barsanti, Jason) |
|
18 | 18
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 04/21 10:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has reviewed the parties Stipulation to Remand (Docket No. 17). The Stipulationstates that it is entered into without prejudice to Defendants right to seek to remove this matter to a United States District Court of competent jurisdiction in the future. Because the Court has already entered a Scheduling Order in this matter, the Court is concerned that the parties Stipulation could result in the evasion of the Courts Scheduling Order and the requirements of the Local Rules. The Court therefore denies the Stipulation. (vv) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 04/20 12:56 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Essendant Co..(Barsanti, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Remanding Case to Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Wed 04/19 6:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is notnecessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. Absent extraordinary circumstances, which must satisfy the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and be brought to theCourt's attention in a timely manner, the Court will not modify these dates. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for Monday, May 8, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. See minute order for details. (jy) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/19 5:47 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. Discovery cut-off of 11/6/2017. Motion cut-off of 11/13/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2017 at 1:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. See order for further details. (jy) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 04/18 12:07 PM
ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS LOCAL RULE 23-3 DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Continue13 . (mrgo) |
|
13 | 13
stip
Continue
Mon 04/17 11:57 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Plaintiff's Local Rule 23-3 Deadline to File a Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Patrick Sinay.(Parker, Jill) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 04/17 11:54 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Patrick Sinay.. (Parker, Jill) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Tue 04/11 8:00 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Patrick Sinay. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attorney Jill Jessica Parker added to party Patrick Sinay(pty:pla)) (Parker, Jill) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jill J. Parker In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Fri 03/31 1:37 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 03/31 1:35 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 03/31 10:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND Defendant Essendant Co.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Essendant Co..(Barsanti, Jason) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Appearance
Fri 03/31 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michelle Lee Flores on behalf of Defendant Essendant Co. (Attorney Michelle Lee Flores added to party Essendant Co.(pty:dft))(Flores, Michelle) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Thu 03/30 2:05 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02315 PA(RAOx). (rn) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 4:14 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 1:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Essendant Co., identifying Essendant, Inc. and Essendant, Co.. (Barsanti, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 1:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Essendant Co.. (Barsanti, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, case number BC651043 Receipt No: 0973-19571812 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Essendant Co.. (Attorney Jason Eric Barsanti added to party Essendant Co.(pty:dft))(Barsanti, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/27 3:02 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Patrick Sinay. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Patrick Sinay. Filed in State Court on 2/17/17 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (car) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/27 3:19 PM
UNCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Patrick Sinay, upon Defendant Essendant Co. served on 2/22/2017, answer due 3/15/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeroge c/o CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Submitted with attachment 2 to Notice of Removal (car) |