Stella M. Ammirante v. Volkswagen Group of America, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02332 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Antelope Valley Nissan, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stella M. Ammirante
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Wed 04/19 5:20 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 3:17-cv-02106 filed 4/14/2017. (lom) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Fri 04/14 10:36 AM
Conditional Transfer Order - 93 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2672, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Case transferred electronically. (dro) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 03/30 10:06 AM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER STAYING CASE by Judge David O. Carter: All proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED pending a determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the "MDL Panel") concerning the transfer of this action. Case stayed., (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dv) |
|
7 | 7
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Wed 03/29 12:19 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:15-cv-01930 DOC(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02332 DOC(SPx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 4:14 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 4:29 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Antelope Valley Nissan, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,, identifying Volkswagen AG. (Oswell, Laura) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Related Case(s)
Fri 03/24 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants Antelope Valley Nissan, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. Related Case(s): 02:15-cv-07367; 2:15-cv-07375; 2:15-cv-07390; 2:15-cv-07391; 2:15-cv-07395; 2:15-cv-07429; 2:15-cv-07430; 2:15-cv-07431; 2:15-cv-07432; 2:15-cv-07473; 2:15-cv-07474; 2:15-cv-07475; 2:15-cv-07477; 2:15-cv-07517; 2:15-cv-01930; 2:15-cv-01948; 2:15-cv-01525; 8:16-cv-00209; 2:16-cv-01143; 2:16-cv-1120; 2:16-cv-01119; 2:16-cv-01104; 2:16-cv-01205; 2:16-cv-01164; 2:16-cv-01507; 2:16-cv-01527; 2:16-cv-01539; 2:16-cv-01563; 2:16-cv-01573; 2:16-cv-01575; 2:16-cv-01576; 2:16-cv-01577; 2:16-cv-01578; 2:16-cv-01580; 2:16-cv-1661; 2:16-cv-1662; 2:16-cv-1663; 5:16-cv-00462; 2:16-cv-01970; 2:16-cv-02014; 2:16-cv-02046; 2:16-cv-02148; 2:16-cv-02210; 2:16-cv-02214; 2:16-cv-02301; 2:16-cv-02302; 2:16-cv-02420; 2:16-cv-02429; 2:16-cv-02438; 2:16-cv-02469; 2:16-cv-2637; 2:16-cv-2796; 2:16-cv-805; 2:16-cv-02892; 2:16-cv-03074; 2:16-cv-03161; 5:16-cv-933; 2:16-cv-03162; 2:16-cv-3163; 5:16-cv-934; 8:16-cv-894; 2:16-cv-3385; 2:16-cv-3537; 2:16-cv-3727; 5:16-cv-1100; 2:16-cv-03776; 2:16-cv-3985; 2:16-cv-04171; 5:16-cv-01238; 2:16-cv-04177; 2:16-cv-04178; 2:16-cv-04179; 2:16-cv-04180; 2:16-cv-04181; 2:16-cv-4242; 2:16-cv-4244; 2:16-cv-4246; 8:16-cv-01111; 2:16-cv-4331; 2:16-cv-04333; 2:16-cv-04336; 2:16-cv-04338; 2:16-cv-4382; 8:16-cv-1139; 2:16-cv-4386; 2:16-cv-4392; 2:16-cv-4393; 2:16-cv-4394; 2:16-cv-4395; 2:16-cv-4399; 2:16-cv-4400; 2:16-cv-4401; 2:16-cv-4402; 2:16-cv-4403; 2:16-cv-4404;2:16-cv-4405;2:16-cv-04406; 2:16-cv-4423; 2:16-cv-4514; 2:16-cv-4630; 5:16-cv-1406; 2:16-cv-4774; 5:16-cv-01468; 8:16-cv-01252; 2:16-cv-04963; 8:16-cv-01256; 5:16-cv-01475; 5:16-cv-01476; 5:16-cv-01480; 2:16-cv-04989; 8:16-cv-01259; 2:16-cv-04997; 5:16-cv-01485; 2:16-cv-05068; 8:16-cv-01292; 8:16-CV-01314; 2:16-cv-5355; 2:16-cv-05631; 5:16-cv-01649; 5:16-cv-01650; 2:16-cv-05669; 2:16-cv-05776; 2:16-cv-05868; 2:16-cv-05874; 5:16-cv-01706; 5:16-cv-01707; 5:16-cv-01708; 2:16-cv-05875; 2:16-cv-05876; 8:16-cv-01456; 5:16-cv-01709; 2:16-cv-05877; 8:16-cv-01457; 8:16-cv-01458; 2:16-cv-05879; 8:16-cv-01459; 2:16-cv-05880; 2:16-cv-05881; 2:16-cv-05882; 2:16-cv-058832:16-cv-05938; 2:16-cv-06023; 8:16-cv-01491; 5:16-cv-01732; 2:16-cv-6564; 5:16-cv-01865; 5:16-cv-01917; 2:16-cv-6831; 2:16-cv-6832; 2:16-cv-6838; 2:16-cv-6839; 2:16-cv-6899; 2:16-cv-6900; 2:16-cv-6909; 2:16-cv-6917; 2:16-cv-06947; 2:16-cv-07065; 5:16-cv-02013; 5:16-cv-02014; 5:16-cv-02017; 5:16-cv-02018; 2:16-cv-07152; 2:16-cv-07255; 2:16-cv-07270; 8:16-cv-01916; 2:16-cv-7799; 2:16-cv-7945; 2:16-cv-7951; 2:16-cv-7957; 2:16-cv-07972; 2:16-cv-7985; 2:16-cv-7990; 2:16-cv-8065; 2:16-cv-8173; 5:16-cv-02392; 2:16-cv-08635; 2:16-cv-08648; 2:16-cv-08988; 2:16-cv-9137; 2:16-cv-9154; 2:16-cv-9235; 5:16-CV-02566; 2:16-cv-9327; 2:16-cv-05355; 2:16-cv-09431; 2:16-cv-09444; 2:16-cv-09446; 2:17-cv-581; 5:17-cv-142; 5:17-CV-00144; 2:17-cv-00652; 2:17-cv-00701; 5:17-cv-00158; 2:17-cv-00704; 2:17-cv-00705; 2:17-cv-00769; 2:17-cv-00775; 2:17-cv-00905; 2:17-cv-00908; 2:17-cv-00928; 8:17-cv-00200; 5:17-cv-00213; 2:17-cv-01071; 5:17-cv-00250; 2:17-cv-01115; 2:17-cv-01119; 2:17-cv-01120; 2:17-cv-01180; 8:17-cv-00274; 2:17-cv-01315; 2:17-cv-01355; 2:17-cv-01356; 2:17-CV-01357; 2:17-cv-01358; 2:17-CV-01359; 5:17-CV-00313; 2:17-cv-01360; 2:17-cv-01447; 2:17-cv-01455; 5:17-cv-00360; 5:17-cv-00361; 8:17-cv-00331; 2:17-cv-01556; 8:17-cv-00365; 5:17-cv-00377; 8:17-cv-00366; 2:17-cv-01622; 8:17-cv-00374; 2:17-cv-01675; 2:17-CV-01676; 2:17-CV-01677; 2:17-cv-01767; 3:17-cv-1118; 2:17-cv-01832; 5:17-cv-430; 2:17-cv-1850; 2:17-cv-001948; 3:17-cv-01283; 5:17-cv-00451; 5:17-cv-00486; 2:17-cv-02080; 9:17-cv-00494; 2:17-cv-02110; 5:17-cv-00555; 2:17-cv-01369-AB-MRW (Oswell, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 4:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Antelope Valley Nissan, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Oswell, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC651438 Receipt No: 0973-19574393 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Antelope Valley Nissan, Inc., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party Antelope Valley Nissan, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., (pty:dft))(Oswell, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/27 12:53 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Antelope Valley Nissan, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Stella M. Ammirante. (esa) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/27 12:56 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Stella M. Ammirante, upon Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 2/23/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent of Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/27 12:59 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Stella M. Ammirante, upon Defendant Antelope Valley Nissan, Inc. served on 2/23/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Dow, person authorized to accept service of process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) |