Erik Brunetti v. Arcadia Group USA Limited et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00545 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
Nordstrom, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Project Social T, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Arcadia Group USA Limited
|
|
Plaintiff
Erik Brunetti
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Thu 10/03 11:27 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (twdb) |
|
Att: 1 attachment | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 04/13 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Erik Brunetti. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Sommer, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/28 1:19 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Project Social T, LLC. (dv) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/28 1:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nordstrom, Inc.. (dv) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/28 1:13 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Arcadia Group USA Limited. (dv) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/27 6:41 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120)4 filed by plaintiff Erik Brunetti. (Sommer, John) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/27 6:40 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120)4 filed by plaintiff Erik Brunetti. (Sommer, John) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/27 6:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120)4 filed by plaintiff Erik Brunetti. (Sommer, John) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Mon 03/27 6:02 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request,5 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/24 4:25 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120)4 filed by Plaintiff Erik Brunetti. (Sommer, John) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Fri 03/24 4:23 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Erik Brunetti. (Sommer, John) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Erik Brunetti, (Sommer, John) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 4:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Erik Brunetti. (Sommer, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19574187 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Erik Brunetti. (Attorney John R Sommer added to party Erik Brunetti(pty:pla))(Sommer, John) |