Mothership Ventures, LLC and Club Mothership NP
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-31776 |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Mothership Ventures, LLC, Debtor
2522 Yale St
Houston, TX 77008-2149 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
86 | 86
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/28 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 70. Notice Date 07/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
85 | 85
order
Dismiss Case
Tue 07/25 11:36 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case 4:17-bk-31776 Signed on 7/25/2017. (adol) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 07/25 11:37 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (adol) |
||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
84 | 84
answer
Response
Fri 07/21 1:09 PM
Response TO TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS= MOTION TO DISMISS CHAPTER 11 CASES . Filed by Mothership Ventures, LLC (Baker, Reese) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
83 | 83
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/21 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 07/20/2017. (Admin.) |
|
82 | 82
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/21 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 07/20/2017. (Admin.) |