The Wet Seal, LLC v. L.A. Market International, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10229
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10229
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50332 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
L.A. Market International, Inc.
24626 Vista Cerritos
Calabasas, CA 91302 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Wet Seal, LLC
7555 Irvine Center Drive
Irvine, CA 92618 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Mon 05/08 9:50 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/27 11:22 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50332 Closed (JAF) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Wed 04/26 2:19 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC (Luton Chapman, Jaime) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Mon 03/27 4:11 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of (i) Complaint; and (ii) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference . Filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Mon 03/27 10:38 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant L.A. Market International, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2017 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/26/2017. (Luton Chapman, Jaime) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 03/27 9:50 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50332 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8388610, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 03/24 8:59 PM
Adversary case 17-50332 Complaint by The Wet Seal, LLC against L.A. Market International, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). AP Summons Served due date: 06/22/2017. (Luton Chapman, Jaime) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D |