Alan Black et al v. Shenzen Sunshine Technology Development, LTD et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Beverly Reid O'Conne |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02370 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2017 3:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shenzen Sunshine Technology Development, LTD
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Sam Tsu
|
|
Plaintiff
Allan Black
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Matos Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Watts
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed alleging that the Onagofly F115 drone is a "worthless product" (arstechnica.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/29/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Dismiss Relief
Fri 09/29 1:59 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM L.R. 23-3 REGARDING DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION26 ; AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS21 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion, STRIKES the class allegations in Plaintiffs First amended complaint, and DISMISSES Plaintiffs First amended complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Court DENIES AS MOOT Acumens Motion to Dismiss. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc). Modified on 9/29/2017. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 09/27 10:56 AM
The hearing on the MOTION TO DISMISS21 AND MOTION FOR RELIEF26 , scheduled for October 2, 2017 at 1:30 P.M., before Judge Otis D. Wright, II, are hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matters stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 09/21 9:22 AM
COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, THE MOTION TO DISMISS21 and the MOTION FOR RELIEF26 will be heard before the Honorable Judge Otis D. Wright, II, on the same date and time the motions were noticed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) |
|
32 | 32
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 09/21 8:02 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Philip Guiterrez, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee. The Court ORDERS that the 1) MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT (filed 7/27/2017)21 ; and, 2) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM L.R. 23-3 REGARDING DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (filed 8/21/2017)26 is hereby assigned to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Do not contact the court regarding the setting and hearing date of this motion. The parties will receive further instructions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/05 12:54 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: denying27 Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth Jay Grunfeld APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Krik J. Wolden. (lt) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Fri 09/01 3:25 PM
OPPOSITION in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from L.R. 23-3 Regarding Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification 26 filed by Defendant Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc.. (Zheng, Yalan) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 08/31 8:47 PM
REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Action 21 filed by Defendant Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc.. (Zheng, Yalan) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Wed 08/30 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth J. Grunfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Allan Black, Christopher Jones, Robert Matos Rivera, Roger Watts (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20431851)27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lom) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 08/30 11:21 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth J. Grunfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Allan Black, Christopher Jones, Robert Matos Rivera, Roger Watts (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20431851) filed by Plaint iffs Allan Black, Christopher Jones, Robert Matos Rivera, Roger Watts. (Wolden, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Relief
Mon 08/21 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from L.R. 23-3 Regarding Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs Allan Black, Christopher Jones, Robert Matos Rivera, Roger Watts. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Wolden, Kirk) |
|
25 | 25
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/21 2:53 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Action 21 filed by Plaintiffs Allan Black, Christopher Jones, Robert Matos Rivera, Roger Watts. (Wolden, Kirk) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Wed 08/09 8:28 AM
ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation for Extension of Time23 Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time through and including August 21, 2017 in which to file their opposition. Defendant shall have through and including August 31, 2017 in which to file any reply. (rfi) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/07 3:25 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Action 21 filed by Plaintiffs Allan Black, Christopher Jones, Robert Matos Rivera, Roger Watts.(Wolden, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 07/27 5:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc., (Zheng, Yalan) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 07/27 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Action filed by defendant Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Zheng, Yalan) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 07/12 10:11 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc. answer now due 7/27/2017, re Amended Complaint/Petition,17 filed by defendant Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc..(Zheng, Yalan) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 06/20 2:26 PM
NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. On May 22, 2017, the court issued an Order to Show Cause. DPlaintiff has filed a response to the order to show cause. The court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 06/19 3:37 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc. answer now due 7/12/2017, re Amended Complaint/Petition,17 filed by defendant Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc..(Attorney Yalan Zheng added to party Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zheng, Yalan) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 05/26 3:23 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc., Does, Shenzen Sunshine Technology Development, LTD, Sam Tsu amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiffs Robert Matos Rivera, Allan Black, Roger Watts, Christopher Jones(Wolden, Kirk) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Response
Thu 05/25 3:34 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Allan Black, Christopher Jones, Robert Matos Rivera, Roger Watts (Wolden, Kirk) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 05/22 7:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall respond by Monday, May 29, 2017, at 4:00 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rfi) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/19 5:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Sam Tsu. (jp) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/19 5:13 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Acumen Robot Intelligence, Inc. (jp) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/19 5:12 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Shenzen Sunshine Technology Development, LTD. (jp) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Wed 04/19 5:11 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request10 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Summons Request - under Category - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. Other error(s) with document(s): Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) event utilized in docketing this filing. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. ***The Summons has been issued.**. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 04/11 3:16 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 03/27/2017, receipt number 261HA4MF), filed by Allan Black Robert Matos Rivera, Allan Black, Roger Watts, Christopher Jones.(Wolden, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 04/03 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Allan Black All Plaintiffs, (Wolden, Kirk) |
|
8 | 8
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 04/03 11:26 AM
Effective April 10, 2017, Judge McDermott will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 630 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 630 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/30 3:41 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Tue 03/28 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth J. Grunfeld. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/28 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): The Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. It should have been filed and entered separately under its proper event. No further action is required. (et) |
|
4 | 4
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/28 11:43 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/28 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) |
|
2 | 2
attorney
Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
Tue 03/28 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Kirk J Wolden counsel for Plaintiffs Allan Black, Christopher Jones, Robert Matos Rivera, Roger Watts. Changing address to 1111 Exposition Boulevard, Suite 602, Sacramento, CA 95815. Changing email to kirk@cwclawfirm.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Allan Black. (Wolden, Kirk) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/27 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19582705 - Fee: $400, filed by Allan Black Robert Matos Rivera, Allan Black, Roger Watts, Christopher Jones. (Attorney Kirk J Wolden added to party Allan Black(pty:pla), Attorney Kirk J Wolden added to party Christopher Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kirk J Wolden added to party Robert Matos Rivera(pty:pla), Attorney Kirk J Wolden added to party Roger Watts(pty:pla))(Wolden, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |