Dupont et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph R Goodwin |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02047 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2019 8:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ethicon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Dupont
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelly Dupont
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
7
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case - MDL
Wed 05/29 10:02 AM
ORDER (Dismissing Ethicon Defendants without Prejudice) granting the Joint Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice filed in MDL 2327, the Ethicon defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from the action(s) listed on the attached Exhibit(s); and if there are no remaining defendants in a civil action, then (a) that civil action is dismissed without prejudice and stricken from the docket and (b) any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/29/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on the attached Exhibit(s)) (kab) (ADI) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/08 8:51 AM
ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
MDL Order Moving Case To Inactive Docket
Wed 06/06 2:56 PM
INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5573 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/6/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp) (ADI) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Of Service
Mon 06/04 8:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shelly Dupont for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Murphy, Peyton) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice To Take Or Amend Deposition
Tue 02/06 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Kevin Benson on 3/8/18 at 9am (Thomas, David) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
ETHICON - Plaintiff Profile Form
Tue 06/20 2:46 PM
PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Joe Dupont, Shelly Dupont. (Murphy, Peyton) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Fri 05/19 11:08 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Mon 05/01 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Pretrial Order 250 - ETHICON MDL MEMBER CASE ONLY
Wed 03/29 11:37 AM
TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 250 (Order re: Qualified Settlement Fund - Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.L.P.) entered on 03/27/2017 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (hkl) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/28 12:45 PM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-5462291. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mh) |