Stone & Webster Construction Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10751
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10751
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10762 |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Stone & Webster Construction Inc.
1000 Westinghouse Dr
Cranberry Township, PA 16066-5228 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago |
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Application, Final Decree
Tue 09/25 2:24 PM
Order signed on 9/25/2018 consolidating the administration of certain remaining matters at the lead case; entering a final decree closing certain affiliate cases; and granting related relief , (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 09/26 10:50 AM
Case Closed. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Application, Final Decree
Tue 09/11 6:57 PM
Application for Final Decree / Notice and Motion of Plan Oversight Board and Wind Down Co for Entry of an Order (I) Consolidating the Administration of Remaining Matters at the Lead Case; (II) Entering a Final Decree Closing the Affiliate Cases; and (III) Granting Related Relief (Hearing Date: 9/25/2018 at 11:00 a.m.) Responses due by 9/18/2018,. (Kimpler, Kyle) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Mon 09/10 3:21 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Appearance
Mon 04/02 5:29 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Melissa Anne Guseynov on behalf of Wachs Technical Services, Ltd.. (Guseynov, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Appearance
Thu 03/22 5:58 PM
Notice of Appearance Notice of Perfection of Materialman's Lien Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 546 (b)(2)(A) filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of Wachs Technical Services, Ltd.. (Rountree, William) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Amended Schedules
Mon 07/31 10:37 PM
Amended Schedules filed:, Schedule G - Non-Individual : Notice of Supplement to Certain of Stone & Webster Construction Inc.'s Schedules of Assets and Liabilities Filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Stone & Webster Construction Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Thu 06/15 12:23 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 05/26 6:51 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Stone & Webster Construction Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Schedules
Fri 05/26 6:50 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Stone & Webster Construction Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Thu 03/30 10:14 AM
An Order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Bankruptcy Rules directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Westinghouse Electric Company LLC, CE Nuclear Power International, Inc., Fauske and Associates LLC, Field Services, LLC, Nuclear Technology Solutions LLC, PaR Nuclear Holding Co., Inc., PaR Nuclear, Inc.,PCI Energy Services LLC, Shaw Global Services, LLC, Shaw Nuclear Services, Inc., Stone & Webster Asia Inc., Stone &Webster Construction Inc., Stone & Webster International Inc., Stone & Webster Services LLC, Toshiba Nuclear Energy Holdings(UK) Limited, TSB Nuclear Energy Services Inc., WEC Carolina Energy Solutions, Inc., WEC Carolina Energy Solutions, LLC, WEC Engineering Services Inc., WEC Equipment & Machining Solutions, LLC, WEC Specialty LLC, WEC Welding and Machining, LLC, WECTEC Contractors Inc., WECTEC Global Project Services Inc., WECTEC LLC, WECTEC Staffing Services LLC, Westinghouse Energy Systems LLC, Westinghouse Industry Products International Company LLC, Westinghouse International Technology LLC, and Westinghouse Technology Licensing Company LLC. The docket in Case No. 17-10751 (MEW) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case . (Richards, Beverly) |
||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Wed 03/29 4:47 PM
Order signed on 3/29/2017 directing joint administration of chapter 11 cases, 17-10751 17-10750 17-10752 17-10753 17-10754 17-10755 17-10756 17-10757 17-10758 17-10759 17-10760 17-10761 17-10762 17-10763 17-10764 17-10765 17-10766 17-10767 17-10768 17-10769 17-10770 17-10771 17-10772 17-10773 17-10774 17-10775 17-10776 17-10777 17-10778 and 17-10779 under 17-10751 (Westinghouse electric Company, LLC, et al.) . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
4 | 4
ans
Declaration
Wed 03/29 10:13 AM
Declaration of Lisa J. Donahue Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the Southern District of New York filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Stone & Webster Construction Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Wed 03/29 7:14 AM
Motion for Joint Administration / Motion of Debtors Pursuant to Fed R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) for Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases filed by Gary Holtzer on behalf of Stone & Webster Construction Inc.. (Holtzer, Gary) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 03/29 6:27 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement / Debtors' Consolidated Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(1) and 7007.1 and Local Rule 1007-3 . Filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Stone & Webster Construction Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
52
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 03/29 4:29 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 04/12/2017. Schedule C due 04/12/2017. Schedule D due 04/12/2017. Schedule E/F due 04/12/2017. Schedule G due 04/12/2017. Schedule H due 04/12/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/12/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/12/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 04/12/2017, Filed by Gary Holtzer of Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP on behalf of Stone & Webster Construction Inc.. (Holtzer, Gary) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 03/29 5:58 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10762 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11780036. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Add Judge
Wed 03/29 8:12 AM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |