SnugglyCat, Inc. v. Rutledge and Bapst, Inc. et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Stefan R Underhill |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00526 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 26, 2017 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Rutledge and Bapst, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ronald Steblea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SnugglyCat, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
58 | 58
utility
Report on Patent/Trademark Form
Fri 03/09 4:25 PM
AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Oliver, T.) |
|
Att: 1 copy of order | ||
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
57 | 57
order
Order
Wed 03/07 11:34 AM
ORDER approving56 STIPULATION of Dismissal. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/07/2018. (Jamieson, K) |
|
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Fri 03/09 4:25 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Oliver, T.) |
||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
56 | 56
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 03/06 7:35 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of [and Proposed Order] by SnugglyCat Inc., Rutledge & Bapst, Inc. and Ronald Steblea by SnugglyCat, Inc. (Greco, Ivana) |