Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Greg N Stivers
Case #: 3:17-cv-00189
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983dp Civil Right Denial of Due Process
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2017
Terminated:Sep 28, 2018
Last checked: Monday Sep 25, 2017 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Matthew Bevin
Represented By
M. Stephen Pitt
Office Of The Governor
contact info
S. Chad Meredith
Office Of The Governor
contact info
Jennifer M. Wolsing
Kentucky Cabinet For Health And Family Services
contact info
Catherine E. York
Kentucky Cabinet For Health And Family Services
contact info
Defendant
Vicky Yates Brown Glisson
Represented By
M. Stephen Pitt
Office Of The Governor
contact info
S. Chad Meredith
Office Of The Governor
contact info
Jennifer M. Wolsing
Kentucky Cabinet For Health And Family Services
contact info
Catherine E. York
Kentucky Cabinet For Health And Family Services
contact info
Justin D. Clark
Kentucky Cabinet For Health And Family Services
contact info
Interested Party
KentuckyOne Health Jewish Hospital
200 Abraham Flexner Way
Louisville, KY 40207
Represented By
Barbara B. Edelman
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Lexington
contact info
Lauren L. Weiner
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Lexington
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc.
200 S. Meridian St. Suite 400
Indianapolis, IN 46225
Represented By
Michael P. Abate
Kaplan & Partners, LLP
contact info
Robert L. Uriarte
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp - San Francisco
contact info
Jennifer M. Keighley
Planned Parenthood Federation Of America
contact info
Lisa T. Simpson
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp - Ny
contact info
Casey L. Hinkle
Kaplan & Partners, LLP
contact info
Karen G. Johnson-McKewan
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp - San Francisco
contact info
Kayvan Ghaffari
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp - Ny
contact info
Anjali Dalal
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp - Ny
contact info
James Edwin McGhee, III
Kaplan & Partners, LLP
contact info
Carrie Y. Flaxman
Planned Parenthood Federation Of America - Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C.
Represented By
Elizabeth Watson
Aclu Foundation
contact info
Jennifer E. Dalven
Aclu Foundation
contact info
Jennifer Dalven
Aclu Foundation
contact info
Heather L. Gatnarek
Aclu Of Kentucky Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Elizabeth K. Watson
Aclu Foundation
contact info
John D. Cox
Lynch, Cox, Gilman & Goodman, P.S.C.
contact info
William E. Sharp
Aclu Of Kentucky Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Donald L. Cox
Lynch, Cox, Gilman & Goodman, P.S.C.
contact info
Brigitte Amiri
Aclu Foundation
contact info
Brigitte A. Amiri
Aclu Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
Ernest Marshall, M.D.
Represented By
Elizabeth Watson
Aclu Foundation
contact info
Jennifer E. Dalven
Aclu Foundation
contact info
Jennifer Dalven
Aclu Foundation
contact info
Heather L. Gatnarek
Aclu Of Kentucky Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Elizabeth K. Watson
Aclu Foundation
contact info
John D. Cox
Lynch, Cox, Gilman & Goodman, P.S.C.
contact info
William E. Sharp
Aclu Of Kentucky Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Donald L. Cox
Lynch, Cox, Gilman & Goodman, P.S.C.
contact info
Brigitte Amiri
Aclu Foundation
contact info
Brigitte A. Amiri
Aclu Foundation
contact info

GPO Jun 23 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 6/22/2017 granting 19 Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene. cc: Counsel (CDR)
GPO Aug 30 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Dave Whalin on 8/30/2017 re 59 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Subpoena. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Protective Order to prevent the deposition of Governor Bevin (DN 59) is GRANTED. cc: Counsel (CDR)
GPO Oct 30 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Dave Whalin on 10/30/2017 granting in part and denying in part 76 Planned Parenthood's Motion for Sanctions. The Governor's Office is ordered to reimburse Planned Parenthood for actual travel expenses incurred in appearing for the previously scheduled deposition and Planned Parenthood's reasonable attorneys' fees incurred in filing the instant motion for sanctions and reply brief. Planned Parenthood is ordered to submit a detailed bill of costs in that regard by 11/21/2017. cc: Counsel (CDR)

Docket last updated: 12/05/2019 11:59 PM EST
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
203 203 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 09/25 9:23 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re192 MOTION for Hearing re189 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held in Contempt Planned Parenthood's Reply to Defendants' Response to Motion for Hearing re Contempt filed by Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc.. (Johnson-McKewan, Karen)
Related: [-]