California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:17-cv-02450
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2017
Terminated:May 15, 2017
Last checked: Monday Sep 25, 2017 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Sergeant Elisabeth Albanese
Defendant
Beverly Hills Police Department
Defendant
City of Beverly Hills
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Detective George Elwell
Defendant
Officer Ryan Lawrence
Defendant
Officer David Leber
Defendant
Sergeant Blake Nance
Defendant
Lieutenant Terry Nutall
Defendant
David Snowden
Plaintiff
Arogant Hollywood
1308 East Colorado Boulevard
Pasadena, CA 91106


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
17 17 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 04/18 11:46 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals11 , CCA # 17-55870 The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered March 26, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Order16 DISMISSED.] (mat)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
16 16 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Tue 03/27 4:49 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals11 filed by Arogant Hollywood. CCA # 17-55870 DISMISSED. (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
15 15 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Thu 01/04 3:19 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals11 filed by Arogant Hollywood. CCA # 17-55870 This appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. (mat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
14 14 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Thu 06/29 10:05 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals11 filed by Arogant Hollywood. CCA # 17-55870 Appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $505 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will automatically stay the briefing schedule under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-11. (car) (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/29/2017) Form 4
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
13 13 appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Thu 06/22 3:32 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-55870 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals11 as to Plaintiff Arogant Hollywood. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
12 12 appeal Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV) Tue 06/20 2:25 PM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Arogant Hollywood, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals11 (mat)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
11 11 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Tue 06/20 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Arogant Hollywood. Appeal of Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis10 Filed On: 5/15/17; Entered On: 5/15/17; Filing fee $ 505 billed. (mat)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
10 10 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/16 2:25 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal denying3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. (see document for details). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (dro)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
9 9 order Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O Mon 04/03 4:50 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (ec)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2017
8 8 order Order Fri 03/31 3:12 PM
INITIAL ORDER IN CIVIL RIGHTS CASES by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ec)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Blank Consent Form
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Thu 03/30 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Order Thu 03/30 3:30 PM
APPLICATION for Order Directing Service of Summons and Complaint by U.S. Marshals Service filed by Plaintiff Arogant Hollywood. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 Thu 03/30 3:27 PM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Arogant Hollywood. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 03/30 3:25 PM
SUPPLEMENT APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Arogant Hollywood. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/30 3:23 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) filed by Plaintiff Arogant Hollywood. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/30 3:21 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arogant Hollywood. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 62 pgs cmp Complaint - (Referred) Thu 03/30 3:20 PM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Elisabeth Albanese((310) official capacities), Elisabeth Albanese((310) in individual), Beverly Hills Police Department, City of Beverly Hills, Does, George Elwell((385) in individual), George Elwell((385) official capacities), Ryan Lawrence((405) in individual), Ryan Lawrence((405) official capacities), David Leber((340) official capacities), David Leber((340) in individual), Blake Nance((305) official capacities), Blake Nance((305) in individual), Terry Nutall((13) official capacities), Terry Nutall((13), in individual), David Snowden(Former Police Chief, in individual), David Snowden(Former Police Chief, official capacities) Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish., filed by Plaintiff Arogant Hollywood. (et)
Related: [-]