Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Ursula Ungaro
Case #: 1:17-cv-21189
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2017
Terminated:Mar 31, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 26, 2017 5:37 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Plaintiff
Michael Blackmoon
1504 Bay Road 2105
Miami Beach, FL 33139


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, March 05, 2018
13 13 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/06 8:31 AM
NOTICE to the Court by Michael Blackmoon (rms1)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2017
12 12 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/27 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Michael Blackmoon (rms1)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2017
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/25 11:43 AM
ORDER denying10 Motion to Reopen Case Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/25/2017. (rms1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2017
10 10 2 pgs motion Reopen Case Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/22 8:17 AM
MOTION to Reopen Case, MOTION to Provide Accomodations as Required Under the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 by Michael Blackmoon. (rms1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2017
9 9 2 pgs misc Letter Thu 04/20 8:38 AM
Letter from Michael Blackmon (rms1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2017
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Wed 04/19 8:25 AM
ORDER denying7 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/18/2017. (lk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2017
7 7 4 pgs motion Reopen Case Mon 04/17 11:34 AM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Michael Blackmoon. (rms1)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2017
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/31 2:45 PM
ORDER denying4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/31/2017. (lk)
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (lk) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/31 2:46 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (lk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2017
5 5 1 pgs MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Michael Blackmoon. Responses due by 4/13/2017 (kpe) Modified on 3/31/2017 (kpe).
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Blackmoon.(kpe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Supplement
3 3 1 pgs Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
Related: [-]
2 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro (kpe)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs COMPLAINT against United States of America. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Michael Blackmoon.(kpe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summon(s)