Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03105
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2017
Terminated:Sep 10, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Patient Centered Primary Care Collaborative
Represented By
Patient Centered Primary Care Collaborative
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, September 10, 2020
11 11 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 09/10 2:38 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 09/08 10:33 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
9 9 order Directing Tue 06/30 10:54 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated (Motion filed in 15-32919
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Tue 02/11 3:17 PM
Notice of Motion For Entry Of Default And Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
7 7 motion Entry of Default Tue 02/11 3:16 PM
Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/08 10:51 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:16 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/04 4:22 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order
Friday, March 31, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Fri 03/31 6:19 PM
Summons and notice issued to Patient Centered Primary Care Collaborative Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 03/31 5:44 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03105 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 25957256, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 03/31 5:28 PM
Adversary case 17-03105 Complaint against Patient Centered Primary Care Collaborative filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2