Covington Place Associates, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 9:17-bk-02044
Lead case is: 9:17-bk-02044
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Caryl E Delano |
Case #: | 9:17-bk-02859 |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 27, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Covington Place Associates, LLC
27299 Riverview Center Blvd Ste 103
Bonita Springs, FL 34134-4322 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - FTM
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E. Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 11/27 2:24 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Tina) |
||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 11/27 2:23 PM
Order Dismissing Cases with Prejudice Barring the Debtors from Refiling for Six Months [Lead Case 17-bk-2044-FMD and Non-Lead Cases 17-bk-2045-FMD, 17-bk-2859-FMD and 17-bk-4172-FMD] . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Tina) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Proof of Service
Thu 04/13 8:41 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration. Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Covington Place Associates, LLC . (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proof of Service
Wed 04/12 6:49 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Directing Payment to the United States District Court. Filed by Luis E Rivera II on behalf of Creditor Carter Bank & Trust . (Rivera, Luis) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Joint Administration
Tue 04/11 9:25 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration - Lead Case 9:17-bk-02044-FMD with 9:17-bk-02045-FMD and 9:17-bk-02859-FMD . Service Instructions: Michael Dal Lago is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Kimberly P.) |
|
court
(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases
Tue 04/11 3:32 PM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case. All papers should be docketed in Case No. 9:17-bk-02044-FMD . (Kimberly P.) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/10 3:24 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded Jonathan L. Hauser to appear on behalf of creditor Carter Bank & Trust . Service Instructions: Luis Rivera is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 04/08 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 04/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Sat 04/08 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 04/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 04/08 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 04/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Proof of Service
Fri 04/07 2:13 PM
Proof of Service of Order Scheduling Initial Status Conference. Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Covington Place Associates, LLC . (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Fri 04/07 1:27 PM
Motion of Jonathan L. Hauser, of Troutman Sanders LLP to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Luis E Rivera II on behalf of Creditor Carter Bank & Trust (Rivera, Luis) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 04/06 9:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Luis E Rivera II on behalf of Creditor Carter Bank & Trust. (Rivera, Luis) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Scheduling (Including BK Trial Matters)
Wed 04/05 4:15 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/19/2017 at 10:30 AM at Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-117, Courtroom E, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL. Service Instructions: Michael Dal Lago is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Brenton) |
|
6 | 6
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Wed 04/05 2:56 PM
Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/17/2017 at 01:00 PM at Ft. Myers, FL (892) - 2-101 United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street. Proofs of Claims due by 7/31/2017. (Brenton) |
|
5 | 5
court
Notice Of Deficient Filing
Wed 04/05 2:53 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. The Summary of Schedules & Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data, Schedules A,B,D,E,F,G,H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Attorney Compensation, Small Business Balance Sheet, Case Management. . (Brenton) |
|
4 | 4
court
Notice Of Deficient Filing
Wed 04/05 2:47 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. The Summary of Schedules & Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data, Schedules A,B,D,E,F,G,H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Attorney Compensation, Small Business Balance Sheet, Case Management . (Brenton) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Tue 04/04 9:15 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
2 | 2
10
pgs
motion
Motion for Joint Administration
Tue 04/04 5:25 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 9:17-bk-02044-FMD with 9:17-bk-02045-FMD and 9:17-bk-02859-FMD Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Debtor Covington Place Associates, LLC (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
assign
Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases
Tue 04/04 9:08 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Caryl E. Delano, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee . (Ellen M.) |
||
court
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Tue 04/04 9:02 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 04/03 9:08 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Verification of Creditor Matrix, and Mailing Matrix. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Covington Place Associates, LLC. (Dal Lago, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 04/03 9:12 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(9:17-bk-02859) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 53214321, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |