Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Virginia M Hernandez Cov
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:17-cv-00787
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2017
Re-opened:Oct 20, 2017
Terminated:Dec 18, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Sep 30, 2017 6:48 AM EDT
Mediator
Peter J. Grilli
Peter J. Grilli, P.A. 3001 W. Azeele St.
Tampa, FL 33609
Represented By
Peter John Grilli
Peter J. Grilli, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
I. C.
Represented By
Kimberly E. Hosley
The Orlando Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Our Children's Academy
Terminated: 08/24/2017
Represented By
Joshua Keith Brown
Peterson & Myers, PA
contact info
Ronald J. Marlowe
Mintzer, Sarowitz, Zeris, Ledva & Meyers, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Polk County School District
Terminated: 08/04/2017
Represented By
Jonathan Stidham
Stidham & Stidham, PA
contact info
Jeffrey Sullivan
Jeffrey R. Sullivan P.A.
contact info
Defendant
School Board of Polk County
Terminated: 09/06/2017
Represented By
Jonathan Stidham
Stidham & Stidham, PA
contact info
Jeffrey Sullivan
Jeffrey R. Sullivan P.A.
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 18, 2017
84 84 3 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Mon 12/18 6:14 PM
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 83 is accepted and adopted. The Clerk is directed to terminate any previously scheduled deadlines and, thereafter, close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/18/2018. (JAM)
Related: [-]