Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-51324

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul Baisier
Case #: 1:17-ap-05090
Nature of Suit66 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2017
Terminated:Jul 11, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Georgia Department of Revenue
1800 Century Blvd NE Ste 9100
Atlanta, GA 30345
Represented By
Georgia Department of Revenue
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph M. Kozak
723 Golf Vista Ct
Alpharetta, GA 30004
Represented By
William A. Rountree
Macey, Wilensky & Hennings LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
misc Adversary Closed Tue 07/11 10:36 AM
Adversary 1:17-ap-5090 Closed (cws)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492) Sat 06/17 1:26 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 06/16/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
7 7 order 01-Order Wed 06/14 9:25 AM
Consent Ordered that Plaintiffs Georgia income tax liability for 2010 is dischargeable upon the entry of a Chapter 7 discharge in this case, but Plaintiffs Georgia income tax liability for 2011 is non-dischargeable. Service by BNC. Entered on 6/14/2017. Related [+](cws)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Joseph M. Kozak
Friday, June 02, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Sat 06/03 1:46 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 06/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
5 5 notice Order and Notice Wed 05/31 7:47 AM
Order and Notice of rule 26(f) conference. Service by BNC. Entered on 5/31/2017. Related [+](cws)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Joseph M. Kozak
Friday, April 28, 2017
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/28 8:58 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Brooke E. Heinz on behalf of Georgia Department of Revenue. (Heinz, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
3 3 misc 0-Certificate of Service Wed 04/05 12:43 PM
Certificate of Service of the Adversary Complaint and Summons filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of Joseph M. Kozak. Related [+](Rountree, William)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
2 2 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Tue 04/04 1:44 PM
Summons Issued on Georgia Department of Revenue Answer Due 05/4/2017 (cws)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/03 5:13 PM
Adversary case 17-05090 Complaint against Georgia Department of Revenue , 66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims) Filed by Joseph M. Kozak (Rountree, William)
Related: [-]