Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Case #: 1:17-cv-01198
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2017
Terminated:Sep 13, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Sep 30, 2017 6:23 AM EDT
Defendant
The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC
Represented By
Christopher E. Adams
Krevolin & Horst, LLC
contact info
Brittany Nash
Krevolin & Horst, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey D. Horst
Krevolin & Horst, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lawrence J. Bellack
Represented By
Vincent C. Bushnell
Fisherbroyles, Llp - Atl
contact info
Cammi Ryan Jones
Fisherbroyles, Llp-Ga
contact info

GPO Sep 13 2017
ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/7/17. (jkl)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
30 30 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 09/13 4:39 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff for costs of action. (jkl)
Related: [-]
29 29 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 09/13 4:36 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/7/17. (jkl)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/13 4:41 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 06/02 9:05 AM
Submission of15 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (btql)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
28 28 respm Reply Brief Thu 06/01 4:25 PM
REPLY BRIEF re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC.(Horst, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Reply Brief
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
27 27 misc Withdrawal of Motion Wed 05/31 9:14 AM
Withdrawal of Motion3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Lawrence J. Bellack filed by Lawrence J. Bellack. (Jones, Cammi)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Wed 05/31 10:21 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: Plaintiff has withdrawn the motion, therefore, Hearing on Motion re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction set for 6/1/2017 at 10:00 AM is cancelled. (ss)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2017
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/22 3:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Lawrence J. Bellack.(Jones, Cammi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Norwest Responses,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Chart of Entities,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Correspondence
Monday, May 15, 2017
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 05/15 9:11 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time through 5/22/17 re15 MOTION to Dismiss . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/11/2017. (ss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2017
24 24 respm Response to Motion Thu 05/11 6:25 PM
RESPONSE re22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re:15 MOTION to Dismiss ,15 MOTION to Dismiss Preliminary Response filed by Lawrence J. Bellack. (Jones, Cammi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 05/10 10:40 AM
Clerks Notation re23 Leave of Absence June 14-30, 2017, August 2-8, 14, 17, 2017, November 17-24, 2017, December 18, 2017-January 2, 2018, by Cammi Ryan Jones. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by C. Jones on these dates. (ss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2017
23 23 misc Leave of Absence Tue 05/09 11:14 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 14-30, 2017, August 2-8, 14, 17, 2017, November 17-24, 2017, December 18, 2017-January 2, 2018, by Cammi Ryan Jones. (Jones, Cammi) Modified on 5/10/2017 to edit docket text (btql)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/09 9:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re:15 MOTION to Dismiss by Lawrence J. Bellack.(Jones, Cammi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond
Friday, May 05, 2017
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 05/05 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction. At request of plaintiff counsel hearing scheduled for 5/5/2017 is RESET. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2017 at 11:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss) Modified on 5/8/2017 to change 5/25 to 6/25(jkl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 05/05 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction RESET from 6/25/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
21 21 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 05/02 4:38 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Protective Order. No depositions will be taken without the permission of the Court until further Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/2/2017. (ss)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/02 3:47 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lawrence J. Bellack.(Jones, Cammi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
19 19 motion Protective Order Tue 05/02 12:24 PM
Emergency MOTION for Protective Order with Brief In Support by The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC.(Horst, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - 4/14/17 Email,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Defendant's Discovery Responses,
Att: 5 Exhibit D- Plaintiff's Discovery Responses,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4/29/17 email,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Discovery requests to Defendant,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - 4/30/17 email,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - 4/18/17 Email,
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/02 2:07 PM
NOTICE re19 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order . The Court has reviewed the motion and any response should be filed by 4:00 p.m. today. (ss)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
18 18 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal Mon 05/01 2:58 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/1/2017. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
17 17 motion Leave to File Matters Under Seal Thu 04/27 5:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re:16 Notice of Filing with Brief In Support by The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC.(Horst, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/27 5:42 PM
PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents Under Seal by The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC(Horst, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit D
15 15 motion Dismiss Thu 04/27 5:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC.(Horst, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit C,
Att: 3 Exhibit E
Wednesday, April 26, 2017
14 14 order Order Wed 04/26 11:34 AM
Consent ORDER for Expedited Limited Discovery relating to diversity jurisdiction. Tentatively scheduling Emergency Motion for TRO & Preliminary Injunction for 5/5/2017 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/26/2017. (ss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2017
13 13 misc Proposed Consent Order Wed 04/19 9:39 AM
PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Proposed Consent Order for Expedited Discovery. (Jones, Cammi)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2017
12 12 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 04/17 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2017. This matter scheduled for TRO & Preliminary Injunction hearing. Parties jointly requested a continuance so that limited discovery may be undertaken regarding diversity as to LLC. Court granted continuance. Counsel to advise when ready to schedule this hearing. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ss)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/17 5:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Nash on behalf of The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC (Nash, Brittany)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/17 5:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E. Adams on behalf of The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC (Adams, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/17 5:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Horst on behalf of The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC (Horst, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2017
8 8 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/14 5:10 PM
RESPONSE re3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC.(Horst, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, April 13, 2017
7 7 order Protective Order Thu 04/13 1:56 PM
Consent PROTECTIVE ORDER, Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/13/2017. (ss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
6 6 misc Proposed Consent Order Wed 04/12 11:26 AM
PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Consent Protective Order. (Jones, Cammi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2017
5 5 service Acknowledgment of Service Thu 04/06 12:04 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Lawrence J. Bellack. The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC served on 4/6/2017. (Jones, Cammi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Wed 04/05 8:59 AM
NOTICE of CANCELLATION OF HEARING scheduled for 4/5/2017 at request of parties and RESCHEDULING Hearing on Motion re:3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing reset for 4/17/2017 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 04/05 11:08 AM
Clerks Notation re4 Certificate of Interested Persons, OK, per TWT. (ss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 04/04 9:31 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Lawrence J. Bellack. (Jones, Cammi)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 04/04 8:46 AM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Lawrence J. Bellack.(Jones, Cammi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Emergency Motion,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/04 8:35 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to The Rainmaker Group Ventures, LLC. (jkl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 04/04 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2017 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Counsel for plaintiff directed to serve defendant &/or counsel for defendant and Gerardo Balboni,II. (ss)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/04 8:32 AM
VERIFIED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lawrence J. Bellack. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7068292.)(jkl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: LLC Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Call Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Promissory Note,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4: Press Release,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5: March 5th Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6: March 16 Correspondence,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7: March 20 Correspondence,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet