New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert B Kugler
Referred: Ann Marie Donio
Case #: 1:17-cv-02253
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2017
Terminated:Sep 06, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Oct 01, 2017 4:34 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
BOROUGH OF GLASSBORO
Represented By
JEFFREY S. CRAIG
Kelley, Wardell, Craig, Annin & Baxter, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
SERGEANT ELIASEN
Represented By
JEFFREY S. CRAIG
Kelley, Wardell, Craig, Annin & Baxter, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
KAMERON TEEL
Represented By
MATTHEW L. SOLOMON
Dion Solomon & Shapiro LLC
contact info
DAVID WESLEY CORNISH
Cornerstone Legal Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
BOROUGH OF GLASSBORO
Represented By
JEFFREY S. CRAIG
Kelley, Wardell, Craig, Annin & Baxter, LLP
contact info
ROBERT A. BAXTER
Kelley, Wardell, Craig, Annin & Baxter, LLC
contact info
Defendant
SERGEANT ELIASEN
Represented By
JEFFREY S. CRAIG
Kelley, Wardell, Craig, Annin & Baxter, LLP
contact info
ROBERT A. BAXTER
Kelley, Wardell, Craig, Annin & Baxter, LLC
contact info
Defendant
JANE DOES 1-7
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-7
Plaintiff
KAMERON TEEL
Represented By
MATTHEW L. SOLOMON
Dion Solomon & Shapiro LLC
contact info
DAVID WESLEY CORNISH
Cornerstone Legal Group, LLC
contact info

GPO Oct 26 2018
OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/26/2018. (tf, )
GPO Jul 09 2019
OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/9/2019. (rtm, )
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
69 69 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 11/06 1:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by BOROUGH OF GLASSBORO. (CRAIG, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]