Maine District Court
Case #: 2:17-cr-00019
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2017
Terminated:Sep 21, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2017 4:06 PM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
MICHAEL J. CONLEY
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
DAVID B. JOYCE
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
KYLE BRAGA (1)
Terminated: 09/21/2017
Represented By
LEONARD I. SHARON
Andrucki & King Law Offices
contact info


Tuesday, April 04, 2017
1 1 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by KYLE BRAGA (jib)
Related: [-]
2 2 INFORMATION as to KYLE BRAGA count 1. (jib)
Related: [-]
3 3 SYNOPSIS as to KYLE BRAGA (jib)
Related: [-]
5 5 PLEA AGREEMENT as to KYLE BRAGA (jib)
Related: [-]
6 6 PROSECUTION VERSION as to KYLE BRAGA (jib)
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY: Initial Appearance held as to KYLE BRAGA. Waiver of Indictment signed and Arraignment held as to KYLE BRAGA Count 1 of the Information, Guilty Plea entered as to KYLE BRAGA Count 1; Plea accepted. Bond Hearing held as to KYLE BRAGA, Bond set and made as to KYLE BRAGA in the amount of $5,000 Unsecured. Order Setting Conditions of Release issued, defendant to be released after processing. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (jib)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to KYLE BRAGA. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
Related: [-]
12 12 Appearance Bond (Unsecured) as to KYLE BRAGA. (jib)
Related: [-]
13 13 Pretrial Services Report as to KYLE BRAGA filed by U.S. Probation. (Access to document is restricted to USA and applicable defendant only) (jib)
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF PRESENTENCE CONFERENCE as to KYLE BRAGA Presentence Conference set for 7/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Judge Hornby's Chambers before JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jib)
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF SENTENCING HEARING as to KYLE BRAGA Sentencing set for 8/23/2017 at 2:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 2 before JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. Sentencing Exhibits and Documents specified in Local Rule 159 are due three (3) business days prior to the sentencing hearing. (jib)
Related: [-]