Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:17-ap-01149
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2017
Terminated:Mar 07, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Independence Office and Business Supply Co., Inc d/b/a Independence Business Supply
Represented By
Independence Office and Business Supply Co., Inc d/b/a Independence Business Supply
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
7 7 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/07 9:33 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1149 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Tue 03/06 3:12 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, with Prejudice, Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Schatzman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 01, 2018
5 5 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Thu 03/01 9:03 AM
Notice of Status Conference scheduled for 04/11/2018 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/18 12:04 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,2 Summons Issued,3 Order Setting Requirements
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Wed 04/05 10:32 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 04/05 10:31 AM
Summons Issued on Independence Office and Business Supply Co., Inc d/b/a Independence Business Supply Answer Due 5/5/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 07/05/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01149 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Independence Office and Business Supply Co., Inc d/b/a Independence Business Supply. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/04 1:52 PM
Adversary case 17-01149 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Independence Office and Business Supply Co., Inc d/b/a Independence Business Supply. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A