Jonathan Payton v. Titan Solar Power et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02619 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 02, 2017 2:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
DOES 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
Titan Solar Construction
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Payton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 05/25 2:19 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Case15 Without Prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 05/23 1:41 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Payton.(Friedman, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Of Dismissal Of Action Without Prejudice | ||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 04/04 11:11 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/25/2018. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for June 4, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (sw) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 06/13 1:53 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition9 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Titan Solar Construction.(Mouzis, Gerald) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Certification and Notice of Interested Parties | ||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 06/12 3:33 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition9 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Titan Solar Construction.(Attorney Gerald William Mouzis added to party Titan Solar Construction(pty:dft))(Mouzis, Gerald) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/15 2:45 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition9 as to Defendant Titan Solar Construction. (bp) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Summons Request
Fri 05/12 3:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition9 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Payton. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
9 | 9
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 05/12 3:08 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Titan Solar Construction amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Payton(Friedman, Todd) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 04/07 9:01 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (pso) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/06 11:36 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Titan Solar Power. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 04/06 11:35 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 04/06 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 04/05 4:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Payton. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/05 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Payton, (Friedman, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 04/05 4:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Payton. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/05 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19639192 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Payton. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Jonathan Payton(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd) |