Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-40525

Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Edward J Coleman III
Case #: 4:17-ap-04015
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2017
Terminated:Oct 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express Centurion Bank
1201 Peachtree Street, NE
Atlanta, GA 30361
Represented By
American Express Centurion Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
James L. Drake, Jr.
P. O. Box 9945
Savannah, GA 31412
Represented By
James L. Drake, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, August 31, 2020
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC Auto) Mon 08/31 7:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by RC. Receipt Number 536365. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
22 22 court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/17 4:21 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-4015 Closed (RTC)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Stipulation Tue 10/17 2:02 PM
Stipulation By James L. Drake Jr. and and Don Smart of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2017
20 20 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Fri 09/01 1:41 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Don Smart on behalf of American Express Centurion Bank (Smart, Don)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2017
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/11 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/10/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/08 12:06 PM
Scheduling Order Filed on 8/8/2017. Pre-Trial Order due by 11/21/2017, plus an additional three days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). Discovery due by 9/22/2017, plus an additional three days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (RTC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 08/02 11:43 AM
Rule 26(f) Report Filed by James L. Drake Jr., Don Smart, Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of American Express Centurion Bank, James L. Drake Jr. (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
16 16 notice Requirement to File Rule 26(f) Report Tue 07/18 12:45 PM
Notice of Requirement to File Rule 26(f) Report Related [+]. Report due by: 8/1/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/11 12:33 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Don Smart on behalf of American Express Centurion Bank Related [+] (RTC)
Related: [-] 11
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Wed 05/10 4:33 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Don Smart on behalf of American Express Centurion Bank (Smart, Don)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
13 13 notice Defective Pleading (Case Mgr use only) Fri 05/05 3:14 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or Before: 5/19/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 11 ,12
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Fri 05/05 1:25 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement Filed by Don Smart on behalf of American Express Centurion Bank (Smart, Don) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2017 (Creel, Renae)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/05 1:19 PM
Answer to Complaint Amended Complaint 11 U.S.C. Filed by American Express Centurion Bank. (Smart, Don)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Wed 04/12 4:36 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 3
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/12 4:16 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 misc Amended Certificate of Service Wed 04/12 4:08 PM
Amended Certificate of Service as to service of Adversary Proceeding Complaint, Summons, Notice, and Rule 26(f) Report Format Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
7 7 notice Defective Pleading (Case Mgr use only) Tue 04/11 2:31 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due Instanter. (RTC)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, April 10, 2017
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/10 7:49 PM
Amended Complaint by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. against American Express Centurion Bank. Related [+]. (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/10 11:41 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Friday, April 07, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued/Reissued Fri 04/07 11:26 AM
Summons and Notice Requiring Rule 26(f) Report. (RTC)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Defective Pleading (Case Mgr use only) Fri 04/07 10:51 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or Before: 4/21/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
2 2 trustee Request to Defer Payment Wed 04/05 3:14 PM
Trustee's Notice of Deferral of Filing Fee in Adversary Case Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. (Drake, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/05 2:50 PM
Adversary case 17-04015 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint by James L. Drake Jr. against American Express Centurion Bank. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount $350 (Drake, James)
Related: [-]