California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referred: Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:17-md-02773
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2017
Terminated:Jan 24, 2019
Case in other court:USCA Ninth Circuit, 18-80135 Ninth Circuit, 19-15159
3rd party plaintiff
Jennifer Milici
Defendant
Qualcomm Incorporated
Interested Party
Avanci LLC
Interested Party
Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc.
Interested Party
Sequans Communications, Inc.
Miscellaneous
Amazon.com, Inc.
Miscellaneous
Apple Inc.
Miscellaneous
ASUS Computer International
Miscellaneous
AT&T Mobility LLC
Miscellaneous
Best Buy Co., Inc.
Miscellaneous
Compal Electronics, Inc.
Miscellaneous
Ericsson Inc.
Miscellaneous
Essential Products, Inc.
Miscellaneous
FIH Mobile Ltd.
Miscellaneous
Google LLC
Miscellaneous
Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
Miscellaneous
HTC America, Inc.
Miscellaneous
Ingram Micro Inc.
Miscellaneous
Intel Corporation
Miscellaneous
Kyocera International, Inc.
Miscellaneous
Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Miscellaneous
LG Electronics, Inc.
Miscellaneous
MediaTek USA Inc. and MediaTek Inc.
Miscellaneous
Motorola Mobility LLC
Miscellaneous
Nokia Technologies OY
Miscellaneous
Nokia USA Inc.
Miscellaneous
Non-Party Blackberry
Miscellaneous
Non-Party Brightstar US, Inc.
Miscellaneous
Non-Party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Miscellaneous
Pegatron Corporation
Miscellaneous
Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Miscellaneous
Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd
Miscellaneous
Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Miscellaneous
Sprint Spectrum L.P.
Miscellaneous
SYNNEX Corporation
Miscellaneous
T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Miscellaneous
US Cellular Corporation
Miscellaneous
Verizon Wireless
Miscellaneous
Wistron Corporation
Miscellaneous
ZTE (USA) Inc.
Movant
InterDigital, Inc.
Movant
NVIDIA Corporation
Objector
LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff
Adrian Esteban
Plaintiff
Alan Schlaikjer
Plaintiff
Alicia Hadnett
Plaintiff
All Plaintiffs
Plaintiff
Allan Rotman
Plaintiff
Allison Shipp
Plaintiff
Allison Tripp
Plaintiff
Alyssa Nee
Plaintiff
Amanda Newsome
Plaintiff
Andre Cruz
Plaintiff
Andrea Hogan
Plaintiff
Andrew Westley
Plaintiff
Armando Herrera
Plaintiff
Beth Crandall
Plaintiff
Bethany Rising
Plaintiff
Betsy Santiago
Plaintiff
Boardsports School LLC
Plaintiff
Brandon Fuller
Plaintiff
Brandon Steele
Plaintiff
Brian Depperschmidt
Plaintiff
Brian Letulle
Plaintiff
Caralyn Tada
Plaintiff
Carlo Caringal
Plaintiff
Carmen Minon
Plaintiff
Carol Harris
Plaintiff
Catherine Kaderavek
Plaintiff
Catherine Schmidlin
Plaintiff
Charles Poon
Plaintiff
Chris Thompson
Plaintiff
Christopher Whalen
Plaintiff
Christopher Zayas-Bazan
Plaintiff
Clarissa Simon
Plaintiff
Colleen Sparke
Plaintiff
Cordt Byrne
Plaintiff
Craig Housenick
Plaintiff
Crystal Hohenthaner
Plaintiff
Cynthia Bambini
Plaintiff
Dalia Zatlin
Plaintiff
Daniel Carroll
Plaintiff
Daniel Delier
Plaintiff
Daniel K. Brendtro
Plaintiff
Danielle LaGrave
Plaintiff
David Carney
Plaintiff
David Floyd
Plaintiff
David Koplovitz
Plaintiff
David Kreuzer
Plaintiff
David Waring
Plaintiff
Dayan Crutcher
Plaintiff
Debra Grasl
Plaintiff
Deirdre McElhaney
Plaintiff
Dwight Dickerson
Plaintiff
Eden Wagner
Plaintiff
Elliot Carter
Plaintiff
Erica Minon
Plaintiff
Ericsson Broadbent
Plaintiff
Gabriel Minon
Plaintiff
Gabrielle Kurdt
Plaintiff
Gail Margolis
Plaintiff
George Marut
Plaintiff
Grant Hauschild
Plaintiff
Guy Dietrich
Plaintiff
Guy Snowdy
Plaintiff
Hallie Lingo
Plaintiff
Ian Carson
Plaintiff
Jaime Martin
Plaintiff
James Clark
Plaintiff
Janet Ackerman
Plaintiff
Janet Silverness
Plaintiff
Jason Schwartz
Plaintiff
Javier Santiago
Plaintiff
Jeff Ciotti
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Davis
Plaintiff
Jeffrey M Kurzon
Plaintiff
Jiying Spencer
Plaintiff
John Solak
Plaintiff
John William Kiefer III
Plaintiff
Jordie Bornstein
Plaintiff
Joseph Kovacevich
Plaintiff
Joyce Grantz
Plaintiff
Julie Ewald
Plaintiff
Karen Carlet
Plaintiff
Karen Hood
Plaintiff
Karen Stromberg
Plaintiff
Kate Mortensen
Plaintiff
Katie Smith
Plaintiff
Kendall Martin
Plaintiff
Kevin Calero
Plaintiff
Kim Coughlin
Plaintiff
Kimberly Scavone
Plaintiff
Kirsten Luenz
Plaintiff
Kyle Weber
Plaintiff
Laura Hallahan
Plaintiff
Laurel Vener
Plaintiff
Leon Theodore Lipka III
Plaintiff
Leonidas Miras
Plaintiff
Lindsay Smith
Plaintiff
Lindsey Carr
Plaintiff
Lisa Patnode
Plaintiff
Logan Griesemer
Plaintiff
Lori Landes
Plaintiff
Lucas Rangel Ferreira
Plaintiff
Mark Cardillo
Plaintiff
Martha Countess
Plaintiff
Mary Beth Cummins
Plaintiff
Mary C McDevitt
Plaintiff
Mary Galloway
Plaintiff
Masood Javaherian
Plaintiff
Matthew Christianson
Plaintiff
Matthew Mitchell
Plaintiff
Melanie Barclay
Plaintiff
Melissa Ju
Plaintiff
Michelle Mackay
Plaintiff
Michelle Reynolds
Plaintiff
Monica Morrow
Plaintiff
Nagore Miles
Plaintiff
Neil Wagner
Plaintiff
Nichelle Lyons
Plaintiff
Nicolas Yousif
Plaintiff
Nina Bartoshevich
Plaintiff
Nuala Vignoles
Plaintiff
Padraic J Brennan
Plaintiff
Patricia Burness
Plaintiff
Patrick Benad
Plaintiff
Paul Nelson
Plaintiff
Paul Scott Ervin
Plaintiff
Peter Yee
Plaintiff
Phillip James Zacharias
Plaintiff
Rachel L. Miller
Plaintiff
Rebecca Davis
Plaintiff
Renee Acosta
Plaintiff
Richard Rizzo
Plaintiff
Robert Links
Plaintiff
Rodrigo Sapla
Plaintiff
Ryan Hart
Plaintiff
Ryan Margulis
Plaintiff
Samuel Roecker
Plaintiff
Sarah Key
Plaintiff
Scott Frederick
Plaintiff
Scott Hansen
Plaintiff
Seth Salenger
Plaintiff
Shari Cole
Plaintiff
Stephan Farid Wozniak
Plaintiff
Stephen Judge
Plaintiff
Steve Krug
Plaintiff
Susan Gonzalez-Pender
Plaintiff
Susan Nagy
Plaintiff
Suzanne Block
Plaintiff
Terese Russell
Plaintiff
Thomas Lammel
Plaintiff
Thomas McMahon
Plaintiff
Thomas McManus
Plaintiff
Tiffany Ringo
Plaintiff
Tina Heim
Plaintiff
Todd Espinosa
Plaintiff
Tom Parkin
Plaintiff
William Horton
Witness
Target Corporation

GPO Nov 10 2017
Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in part and Denying in part 110 Motion to Dismiss.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
GPO Feb 27 2018
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING EUROPEAN COMMISSION DECISION. Re: Dkt. No. 355. Qualcomm must respond to this order by tomorrow, February 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/27/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
GPO Mar 15 2018
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING QUALCOMM'S MISSING DECLARATION. Re: Dkt. No. 368. Qualcomm must file this declaration by tomorrow, March 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/15/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
GPO Aug 29 2018
Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying Without Prejudice 507 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
885 885 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 884 Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiffs to File an Amended Complaint to June 10, 2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
884 884 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
Related: [-]