Connecticut District Court
Judge:Alfred V Covello
Case #: 3:17-cv-00573
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2017
Terminated:Jul 31, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 03, 2017 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Martin Axel Christer Andersson
Represented By
Alfred U. Pavlis
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
William Morten Tong
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Tony Miodonka
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Michael C. Tu
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Ca
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Sf,ca
contact info
Jacob M. Heath
Orrick Herringotn & Sutcliffe, Llp-Menlo Park,ca
contact info
Defendant
Brunswick Rail Group, Ltd.
Represented By
Alfred U. Pavlis
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
William Morten Tong
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Tony Miodonka
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Michael C. Tu
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Ca
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Sf,ca
contact info
Jacob M. Heath
Orrick Herringotn & Sutcliffe, Llp-Menlo Park,ca
contact info
Defendant
Gerard De Geer
Represented By
Alfred U. Pavlis
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
William Morten Tong
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Tony Miodonka
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Michael C. Tu
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Ca
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Sf,ca
contact info
Jacob M. Heath
Orrick Herringotn & Sutcliffe, Llp-Menlo Park,ca
contact info
Defendant
Victor Koshkin
Represented By
Alfred U. Pavlis
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
William Morten Tong
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Tony Miodonka
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Michael C. Tu
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Ca
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Sf,ca
contact info
Jacob M. Heath
Orrick Herringotn & Sutcliffe, Llp-Menlo Park,ca
contact info
Defendant
Marlen Manasov
Represented By
Alfred U. Pavlis
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
William Morten Tong
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Tony Miodonka
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Michael C. Tu
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Ca
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Sf,ca
contact info
Jacob M. Heath
Orrick Herringotn & Sutcliffe, Llp-Menlo Park,ca
contact info
Defendant
Elena Naumova
Represented By
Alfred U. Pavlis
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
William Morten Tong
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Tony Miodonka
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Michael C. Tu
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Ca
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Sf,ca
contact info
Jacob M. Heath
Orrick Herringotn & Sutcliffe, Llp-Menlo Park,ca
contact info
Defendant
OOO Brunswick Rail Management
Represented By
Alfred U. Pavlis
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
William Morten Tong
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Tony Miodonka
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Michael C. Tu
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Ca
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Sf,ca
contact info
Jacob M. Heath
Orrick Herringotn & Sutcliffe, Llp-Menlo Park,ca
contact info
Defendant
Nicolas Pascault
Represented By
Alfred U. Pavlis
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
William Morten Tong
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Tony Miodonka
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Michael C. Tu
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Ca
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Sf,ca
contact info
Jacob M. Heath
Orrick Herringotn & Sutcliffe, Llp-Menlo Park,ca
contact info
Defendant
Charles Emmitt Ryan
Represented By
Alfred U. Pavlis
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
William Morten Tong
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Tony Miodonka
Finn Dixon & Herling LLP
contact info
Michael C. Tu
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Ca
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp-Sf,ca
contact info
Jacob M. Heath
Orrick Herringotn & Sutcliffe, Llp-Menlo Park,ca
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Paul J. Ostling
Represented By
Thomas E. Wallerstein
Venable Llp - Ca
contact info
Carl D. Liggio
Mccullough, Campbell & Lane
contact info
William B. Fleming
Gage Spencer & Fleming LLP
contact info
Glenn M. Cunningham
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
George Kostolampros
Venable Llp - Dc
contact info
Ross H. Garber
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 31, 2018
127 127 order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 07/31 11:33 AM
ORDER finding as moot93 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.)
Related: [-]
126 126 order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 07/31 11:29 AM
ORDER finding as moot97 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.)
Related: [-]
125 125 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/31 11:28 AM
ORDER finding as moot91 motion. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.)
Related: [-]
124 124 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/31 11:20 AM
ORDER finding as moot105 motion. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.)
Related: [-]
123 123 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 07/31 11:12 AM
ORDER finding as moot106 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.)
Related: [-]
122 122 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 07/31 11:11 AM
ORDER finding as moot107 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.)
Related: [-]
121 121 order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 07/31 10:59 AM
ORDER finding as moot108 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.)
Related: [-]
120 120 order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 07/31 10:58 AM
ORDER finding as moot109 motion to seal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.)
Related: [-]
119 119 order Order Tue 07/31 10:57 AM
ORDER. The notice of voluntary dismissal is noted and so ordered. The clerk is hereby directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 31, 2018. (Kontyko, K.)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 08/03 4:42 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 30, 2018
118 118 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/30 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Paul J. Ostling (Fleming, William)
Related: [-]